This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/17/2021 at 00:17:16 (UTC).

DANIELLE CARTER VS OLSEN TORE

Case Summary

On 10/17/2019 DANIELLE CARTER filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against OLSEN TORE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9642

  • Filing Date:

    10/17/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CARTER DANIELLE

Defendant

TORE OLSEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

COWHIG FRANCIS JOHN

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/22/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

10/17/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/17/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/17/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/17/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/17/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketAddress for Francis John Cowhig (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Danielle Carter on 10/17/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Danielle Carter as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 10/20/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Danielle Carter (Plaintiff); As to: Olsen Tore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Danielle Carter (Plaintiff); As to: Olsen Tore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Danielle Carter (Plaintiff); As to: Olsen Tore (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer COWHIG FRANCIS JOHN