This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/27/2016 at 10:49:02 (UTC).

DANIEL POWERS M.D. INC. VS BLADY, ROZA

Case Summary

On 06/26/2014 DANIEL POWERS M D INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BLADY, ROZA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5410

  • Filing Date:

    06/26/2014

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

DANIEL POWERS M.D. INC. DBA DISCOVERY INC.

DANIEL POWERS M. D. INC. DBA DISCOVERY INC.

Defendants

BLADY ROZA

LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT R SHIRI APC

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/01/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • DISMISSAL WITHOUT PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT{S} AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION{S}. /P1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2014
  • FAX RECEIVED: REQUEST FOR DISMISSAL RECEIVED AS TO (DANIEL POWERS M.D. INC.) DBA (DISCOVERY INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2014
  • PROOF OF SERVICE OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM FILED. SERVED AS TO (LAW OFFICES OF ROBERT R SHIRI APC) . COSTS OF $ 0.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • FAX RECEIVED: REQUEST TO POSTPONE TRIAL RECEIVED AS TO (DANIEL POWERS M.D. INC.) DBA (DISCOVERY INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S REQUEST FOR POSTPONEMENT (BEFORE SERVICE) FILED /P1 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2014
  • MATTER RE-SCHEDULED FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING ON 09/02/14 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWP .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • FAX RECEIVED: AMENDED CLAIM RECEIVED AS TO (DANIEL POWERS M.D. INC. DBA DISCOVERY DIAGNOSTICS INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2014
  • AMENDMENT TO CLAIM OF (DANIEL POWERS M.D. INC.) DBA (DISCOVERY INC.) FILED ADDING A 2ND DEFENDANT ,

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN 1140627E0319. HEARING SET FOR 09/04/14 AT 05:30 PM IN DPT. 103.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/26/2014
  • FICTITIOUS BUSINESS NAME DECLARATION ELECTRONICALLY FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where DANIEL POWERS M.D. INC. DBA DISCOVERYDIAGNOSTICS INC. is a litigant