This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/14/2021 at 02:28:24 (UTC).

DANIEL LAVAEE, ET AL. VS PATRICIA MEISELS, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 DANIEL LAVAEE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against PATRICIA MEISELS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Santa Monica Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1540

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAVAEE ROXANNA

LAVAEE DANIEL

Defendants

MEISELS PATRICIA

HACKER RON

BAG FUND INC.

 

Court Documents

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

9/10/2021: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment - Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

9/10/2021: Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal - Notice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

8/13/2021: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

8/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/13/2021

8/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/13/2021

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

5/13/2021: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order: A Request for Court Order and Answer is filed b...)

5/13/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order: A Request for Court Order and Answer is filed b...)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order: A Request for Court Order and Answer is filed b...) of 05/13/2021

5/13/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order: A Request for Court Order and Answer is filed b...) of 05/13/2021

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

2/19/2021: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims) - Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

2/22/2021: Order on Request for Court Order - Order on Request for Court Order

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

2/23/2021: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service) - Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order, Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

2/23/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order, Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

3/1/2021: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for [Notice Of Online Dispute Resolution Meet and Confer]

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

4/6/2021: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

4/6/2021: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

4/26/2021: Request for Court Order and Answer - Request for Court Order and Answer

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

4/29/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Konstantine Kabilafkas

4/29/2021: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) By Konstantine Kabilafkas

12 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/04/2023
  • Hearing01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department S at 1725 Main Street, Santa Monica, CA 90401; Small Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment; Filed by: Bag Fund Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketSmall Claims Appeal - Trial De Novo scheduled for 01/04/2023 at 08:30 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketNotice of Hearing on Small Claims Appeal; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Daniel Lavaee and Plaintiff Roxanna Lavaee against Defendant Bag Fund Inc. on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Daniel Lavaee, et al. on 09/21/2020 for the principal amount of $4,200.00 and costs of $103.20 for a total of $4,303.20.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Daniel Lavaee, et al. on 09/21/2020 as follows: Defendants Patricia Meisels; Ron Hacker do not owe the plaintiffs Daniel Lavaee; Roxanna Lavaee any money on plaintiff's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Non-Jury Trial) of 08/13/2021; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S updated: Result Date to 08/13/2021; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Daniel Lavaee (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/02/2021 10:00 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/26/2021 at 10:00 AM in Santa Monica Courthouse at Department S

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Daniel Lavaee (Plaintiff); Roxanna Lavaee (Plaintiff); As to: Patricia Meisels (Defendant); Ron Hacker (Defendant); Bag Fund Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Lisa K Sepe-Wiesenfeld in Department S Santa Monica Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAttachment; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Attachment, Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BAG FUND LLC is a litigant