This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 03:15:28 (UTC).

DANIEL GARCIA MARTINEZ VS MICHAEL FROEHLICH

Case Summary

On 09/25/2020 DANIEL GARCIA MARTINEZ filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MICHAEL FROEHLICH. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is RONALD F. FRANK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1571

  • Filing Date:

    09/25/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

RONALD F. FRANK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

GARCIA MARTINEZ DANIEL

Defendant

FROEHLICH MICHAEL DBA MOTOR CLASSIC GARAGE

 

Court Documents

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

9/25/2020: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/1/2020: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims) - Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2021
  • Hearing01/19/2021 at 03:00 PM in Department 8 at One Regent Street, Inglewood, CA 90301; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Daniel Garcia Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Froehlich (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 09/29/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Daniel Garcia Martinez (Plaintiff); As to: Michael Froehlich (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ronald F. Frank in Department 8 Inglewood Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 01/19/2021 03:00 PM

    Read MoreRead Less