This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/25/2021 at 00:15:28 (UTC).

DAMIAN KENYON VS UHAUL

Case Summary

On 02/24/2020 DAMIAN KENYON filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against UHAUL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1788

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KENYON DAMIAN

Defendant

UHAUL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GERARD JOHN F.

Defendant Attorney

MAKINDE HANNAH

 

Court Documents

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/24/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/24/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/24/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Complaint - Complaint

2/24/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/24/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/12/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Answer - Answer

7/6/2020: Answer - Answer

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

8/18/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Damian Kenyon on 02/24/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Damian Kenyon as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketAddress for John F. Gerard (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/18/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 08/18/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Advanced and Vacated on 03/12/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Uhaul (Defendant); As to: Damian Kenyon (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Damian Kenyon (Plaintiff); As to: Uhaul (Defendant); Service Date: 03/06/2020; Service Cost: 285.65; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/27/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Damian Kenyon (Plaintiff); As to: Uhaul (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Damian Kenyon (Plaintiff); As to: Uhaul (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Damian Kenyon (Plaintiff); As to: Uhaul (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UHAUL is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer GERARD JOHN F.