This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/14/2020 at 13:54:26 (UTC).

DALE BISHOP VS EAGLE ROCK PLAZA, A CORPORATION

Case Summary

On 02/14/2019 DALE BISHOP filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against EAGLE ROCK PLAZA, A CORPORATION. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1555

  • Filing Date:

    02/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

BISHOP DALE

Defendant

EAGLE ROCK PLAZA A CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

JPMCC 2006-LDP7 CENTRO ENFIELD LLC ERRONEOUSLY SUED AS EAGLE ROCK PLAZA A CORP.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SIMAN AFSHIN

11040 Santa Monica Blvd Suite 212

Los Angeles, CA 90025

Defendant Attorney

MARTINEZ BRYAN

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application To Continue the Trial Date

10/7/2020: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Ex Parte Application To Continue the Trial Date

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue the Trial Date)

10/8/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue the Trial Date)

Answer - Answer

7/30/2019: Answer - Answer

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One

10/10/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Motion and Motion to Compel Responses to Request for Production of Documents, Set One

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/10/2019: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion - Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

11/21/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery"))

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

11/25/2019: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

1/17/2020: Notice of Ruling - Notice of Ruling

Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Compliance with the Court's Order

3/17/2020: Motion to Compel (name extension) - Motion to Compel Compliance with the Court's Order

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Taking Motion to Compel Off-Calendar

6/18/2020: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Taking Motion to Compel Off-Calendar

Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

8/11/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 08/11/2020

8/11/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Court Order Re: Non-Jury Trial) of 08/11/2020

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

2/14/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

2/14/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

2/14/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

2/14/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

2/15/2019: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

2/15/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2022
  • Hearing02/17/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/19/2021
  • Hearing07/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Ex Parte Application To Continue the Trial Date: Filed By: JPMCC 2006-LDP7 CENTRO ENFIELD, LLC Erroneously Sued As Eagle Rock Plaza, a Corporation (Defendant); Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: 10/08/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/19/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketOrder Order on Ex Parte; Signed and Filed by: JPMCC 2006-LDP7 CENTRO ENFIELD, LLC Erroneously Sued As Eagle Rock Plaza, a Corporation (Defendant); As to: Dale Bishop (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue the Trial Date)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue the Trial Date scheduled for 10/08/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 10/08/2020; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2020
  • DocketPursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/08/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 07/19/2021 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application To Continue the Trial Date scheduled for 10/08/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2020
  • DocketHearing on Ex Parte Application Ex Parte Application for an Order Shortening Time or in the Alternative an Order to Continue The Trial Date scheduled for 10/01/2020 at 01:30 PM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 08/13/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/17/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Dale Bishop (Plaintiff); As to: Eagle Rock Plaza, a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Dale Bishop (Plaintiff); As to: Eagle Rock Plaza, a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Dale Bishop (Plaintiff); As to: Eagle Rock Plaza, a Corporation (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Dale Bishop (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/14/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC01555    Hearing Date: November 21, 2019    Dept: 94

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant JPMCC 2006-LDP7 Centro Enfield, LLC’s (1) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff To Respond to Form and Special Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff Ana Luna to Respond to Request for Production of Documents; Request For Sanctions are GRANTED. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO THE INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION WITHIN 20 DAYS. THE REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS GRANTED AGAINST PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00, TO BE PAID WITHIN 30 DAYS.

GROUNDS FOR MOTION: The Court should compel Plaintiff to provide verified responses to the interrogatories and document demands, without objections. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290; 2031.300.) Also, the Court should sanction Plaintiff for failing to serve responses to said discovery. Sanctions are sought in the amount of $462.50 per motion. [Counsel charges $115.00 per hour].

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Dale Bishop (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for personal injuries and property damage against Defendant JPMCC 2006-LDP7 Centro Enfield, LLC (erroneously sued as Eagle Rock Plaza) on February 14, 2019. Defendant filed the instant (1) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff To Respond to Form and Special Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion For Order Compelling Plaintiff to Respond to Request for Production of Documents; Request For Sanctions on October 10, 2019.

On August 13, 2019, Defendant served Form Interrogatories, Special Interrogatories, and Requests for Production of Documents on Plaintiff. (Motions, Martinez Decl., ¶¶3-4 and Exh. A.) To date, Defendant has not received any verified responses to the propounded discovery requests from Plaintiff. (Id. at ¶¶6-8.) Due to Plaintiff’s failure to respond to the propounded discovery response, the Motions are GRANTED. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.) PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS TO THE INTERROGATORIES AND REQUESTS FOR PRODUCTION WITHIN 20 DAYS.

The court also finds Plaintiff’s failure to respond a misuse of the discovery process. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).) Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 2023.010 and 2023.030, and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive given the simplicity of these nearly identical motions. THE REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS IS GRANTED AGAINST PLAINTIFF IN THE AMOUNT OF $465.00 BASED ON THREE HOURS OF ATTORNEY TIME BILLED AT $115.00 PER HOUR, PLUS TWO FILING FEES OF $60.00, TO BE PAID WITHIN 30 DAYS. (See Motions, Martinez Decl., ¶9.)

Moving party to give notice.