This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2020 at 00:02:56 (UTC).

CU REVEST LLC VS WILSON, WILLIE B

Case Summary

On 07/10/2017 CU REVEST LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WILSON, WILLIE B. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****2830

  • Filing Date:

    07/10/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CU REVEST LLC

Defendant

WILSON WILLIE B

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

ATTORNEY AT LAW - CHRISTOPHER BEYER

Attorney at ATTORNEY AT LAW

BEYER CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/7/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/3/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment

5/24/2018: Default Judgment

Request for Dismissal

5/23/2018: Request for Dismissal

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

5/23/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

5/11/2018: Declaration of Costs - CCP 1033

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

5/11/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Proof of Personal Service

3/21/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

3/4/2019: Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment - Acknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/04/2019
  • DocketAcknowledgment of Satisfaction of Judgment; Filed by: (CU REVEST LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIE B WILSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2018
  • DocketAbstract - Request; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketDefault Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Hearing Other scheduled for 06/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/24/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment entered for Plaintiff (CU REVEST LLC) against Defendant (WILSON, WILLIE B) on the Complaint filed by CU REVEST LLC on 07/10/2017 for the principal amount of $14,762.16, interest of $6,136.76, and costs of $439.00 for a total of $21,337.92.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment; Filed by: (CU REVEST LLC) (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: (CU REVEST LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketDeclaration of Costs - CCP 1033; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CU REVEST LLC on 07/10/2017, Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to , Does 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (CU REVEST LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIE B WILSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to WILLIE B WILSON; On the Complaint filed by CU REVEST LLC on 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: (CU REVEST LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIE B WILSON (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2018
  • Docket; Default not entered as to WILLIE B WILSON; On the Complaint filed by CU REVEST LLC on 07/10/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: (CU REVEST LLC) (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIE B WILSON (Defendant); Service Date: 02/23/2018; Service Cost: 69.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketOSC HEARING IS SET FOR 06/24/20 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPARTMENT F43 . ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY VALERIE SALKIN TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE PROOF OF SERVICE AND FAILURE TO FILE DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2017
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO RECORDS RE: FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA538853112. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CU REVEST, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BEYER CHRISTOPHER A.