This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 05/31/2019 at 03:57:08 (UTC).

CTJ 1826 LLC VS JP MORGAN BANK, N.A.

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 CTJ 1826 LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JP MORGAN BANK, N A. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KENJI MACHIDA. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9732

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KENJI MACHIDA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CTJ 1826 LLC

353 S. La Brea Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90036

Defendant

JP MORGAN BANK N.A.

1111 Polaris Parkway

Columbus, OH 43240

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/2/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/2/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

1/2/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/2/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Minute Order - (Court Order)

11/14/2017: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/14/2017

11/14/2017: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/14/2017

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

10/12/2017: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/11/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/02/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: CTJ 1826 LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: CTJ 1826 LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 01/02/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by CTJ 1826 LLC on 10/11/2017 as follows: Defendant JP Morgan Bank, N.A. does not owe the plaintiff CTJ 1826 LLC any money on plaintiff's claim. Other: Upon review of plaintiff's evidence, the signature(s) on that/those check(s) appears to be sufficiently similar to the Business Signature Card maintained by Defendant. Accordingly, the Court rules for Defendant.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Minute Order (Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Court Order) of 11/14/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2017
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Advanced and Continued - by Court was rescheduled to 01/02/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: CTJ 1826 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JP Morgan Bank, N.A. (Defendant); Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 10/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/02/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: CTJ 1826 LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JP Morgan Bank, N.A. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. Kenji Machida in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/16/2017 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CTJ 1826 LLC is a litigant