This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/03/2020 at 07:35:30 (UTC).

CT CALABASAS LLC VS AXIANTA FINANCIAL PARTNERS, INC., ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/19/2019 CT CALABASAS LLC filed a Property - Commercial Eviction lawsuit against AXIANTA FINANCIAL PARTNERS, INC . This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JESSICA A. UZCATEGUI. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3338

  • Filing Date:

    12/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Commercial Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JESSICA A. UZCATEGUI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CT CALABASAS LLC

Defendants

HULES JEREMY

KAVEEVITTAYAKUL KORNKAVEE

ISIDRO MARIA

AXIANTA FINANCIAL PARTNERS INC.

DRACIC PATRICIA

SANDOVAL MARIELA

FUHTRAKOON TOON

SHIN JOHN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ZEFF MICHAEL D.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

12/19/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/19/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/19/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

12/19/2019: Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice - Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (AXIANTA FINANCIAL)

12/20/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (AXIANTA FINANCIAL)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (KORNKAVEE KAVEEVITTAYAKUL)

12/20/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (KORNKAVEE KAVEEVITTAYAKUL)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (JOHN SHIN)

12/20/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (JOHN SHIN)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

12/20/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (ALL OCCUPANTS)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (PATRICIA DRACIC)

12/20/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (PATRICIA DRACIC)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (MARIA ISIDRO)

12/20/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (MARIA ISIDRO)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (JEREMY HULES)

12/20/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (JEREMY HULES)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (TOON FUHTRAKOON)

12/20/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (TOON FUHTRAKOON)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (MARIELA SANDOVAL)

12/20/2019: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) (MARIELA SANDOVAL)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/23/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

12/23/2019: Amended Complaint - Amended Complaint

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/27/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (1st) filed by CT CALABASAS LLC on 12/23/2019, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CT CALABASAS LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2020
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: CT CALABASAS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: JOHN SHIN (Defendant); MARIELA SANDOVAL (Defendant); KORNKAVEE KAVEEVITTAYAKUL (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Summons on Complaint: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Summons on Complaint ( on 1st amended): Name Extension changed from on Complaint to on Complaint ( on 1st amended); As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2019
  • DocketUpdated -- Amended Complaint (1st amended): Name Extension: (1st amended); As To Parties changed from JOHN SHIN (Defendant), JEREMY HULES (Defendant), AXIANTA FINANCIAL PARTNERS, INC. (Defendant), KORNKAVEE KAVEEVITTAYAKUL (Defendant), TOON FUHTRAKOON (Defendant), PATRICIA DRACIC (Defendant), MARIA ISIDRO (Defendant), MARIELA SANDOVAL (Defendant) to KORNKAVEE KAVEEVITTAYAKUL (Defendant), TOON FUHTRAKOON (Defendant), JOHN SHIN (Defendant), MARIELA SANDOVAL (Defendant), PATRICIA DRACIC (Defendant), AXIANTA FINANCIAL PARTNERS, INC. (Defendant), MARIA ISIDRO (Defendant), JEREMY HULES (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketAmended Complaint; Filed by: CT CALABASAS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: PATRICIA DRACIC (Defendant); TOON FUHTRAKOON (Defendant); JEREMY HULES (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CT CALABASAS LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2019
  • DocketNotice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 12/20/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 02/27/2020 at 08:30 AM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CT CALABASAS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: AXIANTA FINANCIAL (Defendant); PATRICIA DRACIC (Defendant); TOON FUHTRAKOON (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CT CALABASAS LLC (Plaintiff); As to: AXIANTA FINANCIAL (Defendant); PATRICIA DRACIC (Defendant); TOON FUHTRAKOON (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketProperty Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jessica A. Uzcategui in Department H Van Nuys Courthouse East

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CT CALABASAS LLC A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZEFF MICHAEL D.