This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 00:34:02 (UTC).

CRYSTAL ARELLANO VS BALBINA MEJIA DE ODILON

Case Summary

On 01/05/2018 CRYSTAL ARELLANO filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against BALBINA MEJIA DE ODILON. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0238

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DEBORAH L. CHRISTIAN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ARELLANO CRYSTAL

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Defendant

DE ODILON BALBINA MEJIA

Los Angeles, CA 90017

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Defendant Attorney

POST ERIC MITCHELL

 

Court Documents

Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Order Shortening time

2/23/2018: Ex Parte Application (name extension) - Order Shortening time

Request for Dismissal

3/22/2018: Request for Dismissal

Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

1/25/2018: Request/Counter-Request To Set Case For Trial

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

1/17/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

1/26/2018: Default Judgment - Unlawful Detainer

Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

1/26/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer Trial

Answer

1/18/2018: Answer

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

1/18/2018: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Summons - on Complaint

1/5/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

1/5/2018: Complaint

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Balbina Mejia De Odilon)

1/5/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (Balbina Mejia De Odilon)

Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

1/5/2018: Notice of Unlawful Detainer (Eviction) - (ALL OCCUPANTS)

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 03/22/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Request for Dismissal; Filed by: Crystal Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Request for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2018
  • Brief in Support of Defendant's Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: Balbina Mejia De Odilon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/22/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Ex Parte Application Order Shortening time; Filed by: Balbina Mejia De Odilon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Hearing on Ex Parte Application Order shortening time scheduled for 02/23/2018 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing on Ex Parte Application Order shortening time)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Updated -- Ex Parte Application Order Shortening time: Result: Granted; Result Date: 02/23/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2018
  • Hearing on Ex Parte Application Order shortening time scheduled for 02/23/2018 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 02/23/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
21 More Docket Entries
  • 01/17/2018
  • Default entered as to Balbina Mejia De Odilon; On the Complaint filed by Crystal Arellano on 01/05/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Complaint; Filed by: Crystal Arellano (Plaintiff); As to: Balbina Mejia De Odilon (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Crystal Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Crystal Arellano (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Property Owner/Landlord Only Hearing Notice; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Deborah L. Christian in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Order to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 03/16/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Civil Clerk's Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2018
  • Notice of Unlawful Detainer mailed 01/08/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer POST ERIC MITCHELL