This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/05/2019 at 20:36:03 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC VS SCHULTE, DANAI

Case Summary

On 11/04/2013 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against SCHULTE, DANAI. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are GRACIELA L. FREIXES and ROBERT J. SCHUIT. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3414

  • Filing Date:

    11/04/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA L. FREIXES

Presiding Judge

ROBERT J. SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

SCHULTE DANAI

HUSTLER MUSIC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

LAW OFFICE OF CURTIS O BARNES - VIJAY S DESAI

LAW OFFICE OF RORY W. CLARK, APLC - MATTHEW J. KUMAR ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF RORY W. CLARK, APLC

KUMAR MATTHEW J. ESQ

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/23/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Case Destroyed pursuant to California Government Code Section 68151 and 68153.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2016
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. F43 , HON. ROBERT J. SCHUIT, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2016
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. F43 , HON. ROBERT J. SCHUIT, JUDGE PRESIDING FOR HEARING ON ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE. NO APPEARANCE BY OR FOR EITHER PARTY. THE COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO JUDGES CHAMBERS RE: 10/31/16 CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • DocketSUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY FILED FOR PLAINTIFF (CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: NON SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO MASTER FILING CABINET.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketCOLLECTIONS CASE COMPLAINT FILED PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740. RN CHA254564101. Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY GRACIELA L. FREIXES, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 10/31/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. F43 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketDECLARATION RE: VENUE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2013
  • DocketORDER TO SHOW CAUSE HEARING SIGNED AND FILED BY GRACIELA L. FREIXES, JUDGE TO SHOW WHY SANCTIONS SHOULD NOT BE IMPOSED FOR FAILURE TO FILE REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO CRC 3.740(F). MATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING ON 10/31/16 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. F43 . CERTIFICATE OF MAILING FILED, GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/ COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer LAW OFFICES OF CURTIS O BARNES - VIJAY S. DESAI ESQ

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kumar, Matthew J