Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/15/2020 at 16:01:55 (UTC).

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC VS ADETUTU LONGE

Case Summary

On 04/29/2020 CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT, LLC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ADETUTU LONGE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2670

  • Filing Date:

    04/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Chatsworth Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CROWN ASSET MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendant

LONGE ADETUTU

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FARZIN ALI

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

7/24/2020: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

5/13/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/29/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

4/29/2020: Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1) - Declaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

4/29/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC on 04/29/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Crown Asset Management, LLC as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 07/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 05/05/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Crown Asset Management, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Adetutu Longe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Crown Asset Management, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Adetutu Longe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketDeclaration in Support of Bus. & Prof. Code 6322.1(c)(1); Filed by: Crown Asset Management, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Adetutu Longe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Crown Asset Management, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Adetutu Longe (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crown Asset Management LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FARZIN, ALI