This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/31/2019 at 00:13:32 (UTC).

CRISTINA E. KIM VS ADOLFO ECHEAGARAY, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 05/01/2018 a Property - Other Real Property case was filed by CRISTINA E KIM against ADOLFO ECHEAGARAY in the jurisdiction of Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6593

  • Filing Date:

    05/01/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KIM CRISTINA E.

Defendants

ECHEAGARAY ERICA AKA ERICKA ECHEAGARAY

IBARRA MARIA DEL CARMEN

ECHEAGARAY MANUEL SALVADOR

IBARRA SILVIO GUADALUPE

ECHEAGARAY ADOLFO

ECHEAGARAY ALICIA

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF STEVEN G. CANDELAS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE

8/30/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration OF STEVEN G. CANDELAS IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

10/1/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Reply (name extension) - Reply REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE

10/1/2019: Reply (name extension) - Reply REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL FORM INTERROGATORIES SET ONE

Reply (name extension) - Reply REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SET ONE

10/1/2019: Reply (name extension) - Reply REPLY TO OPPOSITION TO MOTION TO COMPEL REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS SET ONE

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF JOHN F. MANSOUR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE

10/2/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF JOHN F. MANSOUR IN SUPPORT OF EX PARTE

Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion

10/16/2019: Notice of Motion - Notice of Motion

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Alicia Echeagaray

2/21/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Alicia Echeagaray

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

2/21/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/5/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

8/5/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: PLAINTIFF CRISTINA E. KIM'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO HAVE MATTERS DEEMED ADMITTED, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION- SET ONE; MEMOR

8/5/2019: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: PLAINTIFF CRISTINA E. KIM'S NOTICE OF MOTION TO HAVE MATTERS DEEMED ADMITTED, OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUESTS FOR ADMISSION- SET ONE; MEMOR

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: PLAINTIFF CRISTINA E. KIM'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES- SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARAT

8/5/2019: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: PLAINTIFF CRISTINA E. KIM'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES- SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARAT

Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: PLAINTIFF CRISTINA E. KIM'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ; DECLARAT

8/5/2019: Motion re: (name extension) - Motion re: PLAINTIFF CRISTINA E. KIM'S NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION- SET ONE; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES ; DECLARAT

Proof of Personal Service - (Amended)

9/18/2018: Proof of Personal Service - (Amended)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended)

9/18/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - (Amended)

Proof of Personal Service

5/24/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

5/1/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

53 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/04/2021
  • Hearing05/04/2021 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2020
  • Hearing04/16/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/03/2020
  • Hearing03/03/2020 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing12/09/2019 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing12/09/2019 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing12/09/2019 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/09/2019
  • Hearing12/09/2019 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Motion to Compel Further Discovery Responses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Reclassify (Walker Motion) scheduled for 03/03/2020 at 10:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketNotice of Motion; Filed by: Cristina E. Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2019
  • DocketDeclaration OF JOHN F. MANSOUR IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO RECLASSIFY ACTION FROM LIMITED TO UNLIMITED JURISDICTION; Filed by: Cristina E. Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
82 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Cristina E. Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Manuel Salvador Echeagaray (Defendant); Service Date: 05/16/2018; Service Cost: 110.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2018
  • DocketNotice of Rejection - Fax Filing; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Cristina E. Kim (Plaintiff); As to: Adolfo Echeagaray (Defendant); Erica Echeagaray (Defendant); Manuel Salvador Echeagaray (Defendant) et al.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Cristina E. Kim (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/29/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 05/04/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 18STLC06593    Hearing Date: December 09, 2019    Dept: 94

Kim v. Echeagaray, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL DEPOSITION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP § 2025.450)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Plaintiff Cristina E. Kim’s Discovery Motions are PLACED OFF CALENDAR. THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED TO THE TRANSFER/RECLASSIFICATION DESK FOR COLLECTION OF FEES AND REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS.

ANALYSIS:

Plaintiff Cristina E. Kim (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action for breach of contract, common counts, quiet title, and declaratory relief against Defendant Erica Echeagaray aka Erika Echeagaray (“Defendant”) and others. The remaining named Defendants have defaulted or been dismissed. Plaintiff filed the instant discovery Motions on April 26, 2019.

As a limited jurisdiction court, this Court lacks jurisdiction to grant the relief sought in the Complaint. Specifically, the requests for declaratory relief and to quiet title are outside the jurisdiction of this Court. (See Code Civ. Proc., §§ 85, 86, subds. (a)(7), (b); Orcilla v. Big Sur, Inc. (2016) 244 Cal.App.4th 982, 1011.)

THIS CASE IS RECLASSIFIED AS AN UNLIMITED CIVIL CASE AND TRANSFERRED THE TRANSFER/RECLASSIFICATION DESK FOR COLLECTION OF FEES AND REASSIGNMENT TO AN INDEPENDENT CALENDAR COURT. PLAINTIFF IS ORDERED TO PAY THE RECLASSIFICATION FEE WITHIN TEN (10) DAYS.

Court clerk to give notice.