This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/27/2016 at 09:21:51 (UTC).

CRESS, MITZI, TRUSTEE OF THE DAN VS CARBAJAL, JOE

Case Summary

On 03/15/2013 CRESS, MITZI, TRUSTEE OF THE DAN filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against CARBAJAL, JOE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0275

  • Filing Date:

    03/15/2013

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRESS MITZI TRUSTEE OF THE DAN

Defendant

CARBAJAL JOE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF REBECCA HUFFORD COHEN

Defendant Attorney

CARBAJAL, JOE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/25/2013
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • STIPULATION AND JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • STIPULATION JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • WRITTEN STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • NOTICE OF TRIAL MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 04/12/13, 01:30 PM, DEPT 88

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2013
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • DEFAULT ENTERED FOR ALL OTHER OCCUPANTS PURSUANT TO CCP 415.46

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2013
  • MEMO TO SET CASE FOR TRIAL FILED-30 MIN(S)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • FEE WAIVER FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2013
  • RESPONSE FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2013
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2013
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less