This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/20/2020 at 01:16:37 (UTC).

CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION, VS MASIS PATATANYAN TRUST,, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 03/13/2019 CRENSHAW LUMBER CO , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against MASIS PATATANYAN TRUST. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ROBERT SCHUIT. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0098

  • Filing Date:

    03/13/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ROBERT SCHUIT

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

MASIS PATATANYAN TRUST

ALLSTATE CONSTRUCTION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PARIS JEFFREY A.

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

3/13/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

3/13/2019: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

3/13/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

3/13/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

3/13/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

3/22/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

3/22/2019: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 03/18/2020

3/18/2020: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 03/18/2020

Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

3/18/2020: Minute Order - Minute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/14/2022
  • Hearing03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/14/2022 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketMinute Order (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for (Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and ...) of 03/18/2020; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2020
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 03/14/2022 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California corporation, (Plaintiff); As to: ALLSTATE CONSTRUCTION (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 03/21/2019; Service Cost: 64.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California corporation, (Plaintiff); As to: MASIS PATATANYAN TRUST, (Defendant); Service Date: 03/20/2019; Service Cost: 64.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California corporation, (Plaintiff); As to: MASIS PATATANYAN TRUST, (Defendant); ALLSTATE CONSTRUCTION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California corporation, (Plaintiff); As to: MASIS PATATANYAN TRUST, (Defendant); ALLSTATE CONSTRUCTION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California corporation, (Plaintiff); As to: MASIS PATATANYAN TRUST, (Defendant); ALLSTATE CONSTRUCTION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California corporation, (Plaintiff); As to: MASIS PATATANYAN TRUST, (Defendant); ALLSTATE CONSTRUCTION (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 03/18/2020 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Robert Schuit in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crenshaw Lumber Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIS JEFFREY A.