This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2021 at 17:15:42 (UTC).

CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS ARSHIA REFOUA, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 11/19/2020 CRENSHAW LUMBER CO , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against ARSHIA REFOUA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Other.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7944

  • Filing Date:

    11/19/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CRENSHAW LUMBER CO. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

REFOUA ARSHIA

NCC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC.

VALLEJOS; MARINELA PINEDA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

PARIS KAREN

 

Court Documents

Complaint - Complaint

11/19/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

11/19/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

11/19/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

12/4/2020: Proof of Service - No Service - Proof of Service - No Service

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

12/17/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

1/13/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California Corporation on 11/19/2020, entered Request for Dismissal without prejudice filed by CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California Corporation as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 01/13/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ARSHIA REFOUA (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/07/2020; Service Cost: 64.50; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketProof of Service - No Service; Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ARSHIA REFOUA (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ARSHIA REFOUA (Defendant); NCC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC., (Defendant); MARINELA PINEDA VALLEJOS; (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ARSHIA REFOUA (Defendant); NCC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC., (Defendant); MARINELA PINEDA VALLEJOS; (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CRENSHAW LUMBER CO., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: ARSHIA REFOUA (Defendant); NCC CONSTRUCTION & DEVELOPMENT INC., (Defendant); MARINELA PINEDA VALLEJOS; (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Crenshaw Lumber Co. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer PARIS AND PARIS LLP - KAREN M. PARIS