This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/05/2019 at 02:25:50 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC

Case Summary

On 06/12/2018 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0213

  • Filing Date:

    06/12/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendant

WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC AKA WINSFARGO TRANSPORT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH JAY

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

8/15/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

9/26/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

9/26/2018: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Pursuant to C.C. Section 1717.5

9/26/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Pursuant to C.C. Section 1717.5

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Method of Calculating Interest

9/26/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Re: Method of Calculating Interest

Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

9/26/2018: Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment - Declaration Pursuant to 585 CCP in Support of Default Judgment

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 11/13/2018 entered for Plaintiff Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. against Defendant Winsfargo Transport INC AKA Winsfargo Transport.

11/13/2018: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 11/13/2018 entered for Plaintiff Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. against Defendant Winsfargo Transport INC AKA Winsfargo Transport.

Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Application and Order for Appearance and Examination as to Guoxiang Wang

1/8/2019: Application and Order for Appearance and Examination - Application and Order for Appearance and Examination as to Guoxiang Wang

Summons - on Complaint

6/12/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/12/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint

6/12/2018: Complaint

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/12/2018: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/12/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/09/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 04/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Party on 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 04/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination as to Guoxiang Wang; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Winsfargo Transport INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/15/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketJudgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 11/13/2018 entered for Plaintiff Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. against Defendant Winsfargo Transport INC AKA Winsfargo Transport. Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. against Defendant Winsfargo Transport INC AKA Winsfargo Transport on the Complaint filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. on 06/12/2018 for the principal amount of $4,258.66, damages of $121.34, attorney fees of $1,200.00, and costs of $285.63 for a total of $5,865.63.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/13/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 11/13/2018 entered for Plaintiff Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. against Defendant Winsfargo Transport INC AKA Winsfargo Transport.: As To Parties: removed; Status changed from Filed to Signed and Filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Winsfargo Transport INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketDefault entered as to Winsfargo Transport INC; On the Complaint filed by Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. on 06/12/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Does: 1-10

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/26/2018
  • DocketDeclaration Re: Method of Calculating Interest; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Winsfargo Transport INC (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 08/01/2018; Service Cost: 60.63; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Winsfargo Transport INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where WINSFARGO TRANSPORT INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FREED KENNETH JAY