This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/23/2016 at 00:44:02 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC VS STELEE INDUSTRIES INC

Case Summary

On 09/18/2012 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against STELEE INDUSTRIES INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4048

  • Filing Date:

    09/18/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC

Defendants

STELEE INDUSTRIES INC

412 WALL STREET LLC

TOWNE & 333 LLC

LTL COMMERCIAL LLC

MP CAPITAL LLC

57TH & BROADWAY LLC

HO HOS LLC

5811 LLC

CENTRAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J FREED

Defendant Attorney

DRINKER BIDDLE & REATH LLP

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/13/2015
  • DocketCASE DESTROYED PURSUANT TO GC 68152 D(1)/GC 68152 D(2)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2014
  • DocketHEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2014
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2014
  • DocketOSC SET 04/22/14, 0830 AM, DEPT. 57, NOTICE FILED & MAILED * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • DocketELECTION NOT TO FILE AFFIDAVIT CCP 170.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • DocketTRANSFER ORDER - CASE TRANSFERRED TO DEPT. 57(MOSK) FOR TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2014
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL COMMENCED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketJOINT WITNESS LIST FILED BY ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2014
  • DocketJOINT EXHIBIT LIST FILED BY ATTORNEYS FOR DEFENDANT.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2014
  • DocketNOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
23 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - COLLECTION CASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/18/2012
  • DocketCMR SET 03/22/13, 0830 AM, DEPT. 77, NOTICE FILED & MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where STELEE INDUSTRIES INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where LTL COMMERCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where CENTRAL OFFICE is a litigant

Latest cases where TOWNE AND 333 LLC A CALIFORNIA LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY is a litigant