This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/19/2020 at 20:22:08 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS RESMAC, INC.

Case Summary

On 06/15/2020 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against RESMAC, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GRACIELA FREIXES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3888

  • Filing Date:

    06/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GRACIELA FREIXES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendant

RESMAC INC. DBA COMMAND MORTGAGE DBA FIRST CAPITAL GROUP DBA FIRST USA HOME LOANS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FREED KENNETH

Defendant Attorney

ZHANG JJ

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

7/15/2020: Answer - Answer

Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

7/15/2020: Notice of Trial - Notice of Trial

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/15/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

6/15/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

6/15/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/21/2021
  • Hearing06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department F43 at 9425 Penfield Ave., Chatsworth, CA 91311; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: RESMAC, INC. (Defendant); As to: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Trial; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Event scheduled for 06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Type changed from Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 to Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RESMAC, INC. (Defendant); Service Date: 06/29/2020; Service Cost: 65.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RESMAC, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RESMAC, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: RESMAC, INC. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 06/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Graciela Freixes in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20CHLC13888    Hearing Date: May 7, 2021    Dept: NCB

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

North Central District

Department B

creditors adjustment bureau, inc.,

Plaintiff,

v.

resmac, inc. dba command mortgage adba first capital group adba first usa home loans,

Defendant.

Case No.: 20CHLC13888

Hearing Date: May 7, 2021

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motion to compel discovery responses; request for sanctions

On April 1, 2021, Plaintiff Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed a motion to compel initial responses from Defendant Resmac, Inc. (“Defendant”) for Special Interrogatories (“SROG”), set two.

On October 20, 2020, Plaintiff served on Defendant the discovery requests. Plaintiff’s counsel contacted Defendant’s counsel on various occasions to request responses to the discovery and provided multiple extensions. As of the filing of the motions, Plaintiff states that it has not received responses from Defendant.

Plaintiff’s unopposed motions to compel responses to the SROG is granted. Defendant is ordered to provide verified responses to Plaintiff’s discovery requests, without objections, within 20 days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff requests sanctions against Defendant and its attorney in the sum of $1,561.65. The request is granted, but in a reduced, reasonable amount of $560 (which account for a reasonable time of 2 hours at $250/hour for this relatively simple motion to compel initial responses, plus $60 in filing fees). Defendant and its counsel of record, jointly and severally, are ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $560 to Plaintiff, by and through counsel, within 20 days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff shall provide notice of this order.

Case Number: 20CHLC13888    Hearing Date: March 22, 2021    Dept: NCB

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

North Central District

Department B

creditors adjustment bureau, inc.,

Plaintiff,

v.

resmac, inc. dba command mortgage adba first capital group adba first usa home loans,

Defendant.

Case No.: 20CHLC13888

Hearing Date: March 22, 2021

[TENTATIVE] order RE:

motions to compel discovery responses; requests for sanctions

On October 27, 2020, Plaintiff Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. (“Plaintiff”) filed a motion to compel initial responses from Defendant Resmac, Inc. (“Defendant”) for Demand for Production and Inspection of Documents and Other Tangible Things (“DFP”), set one.

On July 15, 2020, Plaintiff served on Defendant the discovery requests. Plaintiff’s counsel contacted Defendant’s counsel on September 14, 16, and 22, 2020, requesting responses and apprising Defendant of Plaintiff’s intention to file a motion. On September 23, 2020, defense counsel asked whether responses could be sent by mail or email, to which Plaintiff’s counsel responded that responses by email were acceptable. Plaintiff’s counsel then contacted defense counsel on October 14, 2020, requesting responses. As of the filing of the motion, Plaintiff states that it has not received responses from Defendant.

Plaintiff’s unopposed motion to compel responses to the DFP is granted pursuant to CCP § 2031.300. Defendant is ordered to provide verified responses to Plaintiff’s discovery requests, without objections, within twenty (20) days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff requests sanctions against Defendant. The request is granted in the amount of $475.80 (2 hours x a reasonable rate of $200/hour for this relatively simple motion to compel initial responses, plus $75.80 for e-filing fees). Defendant and its counsel of record, jointly and severally, are ordered to pay monetary sanctions in the amount of $475.80 to Plaintiff, by and through counsel, within twenty (20) days of notice of this order.

Plaintiff shall provide notice of this order.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where RESMAC INC is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ZHANG JJ