This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/26/2016 at 13:50:12 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC VS NITTANY LION LANDSCAPING, INC.

Case Summary

On 04/27/2015 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against NITTANY LION LANDSCAPING, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****4943

  • Filing Date:

    04/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC

Defendant

NITTANY LION LANDSCAPING INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICES OF KENNETH J FREED

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2016
  • WRIT RETURNED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED-LA COUNTY-ATTORNEY SERVICE BIN-AB;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2015
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DECLARATIONS IN SUPPORT OF COURT JUDGMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2015
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/17/2015
  • DEFAULT PREVIOUSLY ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2015
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT ONLY PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/15/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2015
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 10/27/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2015
  • OSC SET 04/27/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NITTANY LION LANDSCAPING INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant