This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/26/2021 at 14:17:15 (UTC).

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. VS AABLE SECURITY LLC, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2020 CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against AABLE SECURITY LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Chatsworth Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is KAREN MOSKOWITZ. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5003

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

KAREN MOSKOWITZ

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU INC.

Defendants

AABLE SECURITIES INC

AABLE SECURITY LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other Attorneys

FREED KENNETH

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/11/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Complaint - Complaint

10/26/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/26/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/26/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/26/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/26/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. on 10/26/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 11/01/2021 at 08:30 AM in Chatsworth Courthouse at Department F43

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: AABLE SECURITY LLC (Defendant); AABLE SECURITIES INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: AABLE SECURITY LLC (Defendant); AABLE SECURITIES INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CREDITORS ADJUSTMENT BUREAU, INC. (Plaintiff); As to: AABLE SECURITY LLC (Defendant); AABLE SECURITIES INC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Karen Moskowitz in Department F43 Chatsworth Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where AABLE SECURITY is a litigant

Latest cases where Creditors Adjustment Bureau, Inc. is a litigant