This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/06/2019 at 12:50:04 (UTC).

CP III VUE, LLC VS INGLIS, WENDY

Case Summary

On 01/24/2012 CP III VUE, LLC filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against INGLIS, WENDY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, San Pedro Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0092

  • Filing Date:

    01/24/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    San Pedro Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CP III VUE LLC

Defendant

INGLIS WENDY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorneys

TRINKAUS, KIMBERLY K.

DANIEL R. SEGNIT

SEGNIT DANIEL R.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/28/2015
  • MEMORANDUM OF ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $579.84 MEMORANDUM OF ACCRUED INTEREST IN THE AMOUNT OF $579.84

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2014
  • WRIT OF EXECUTION ISSUED ORANGE COUNTY writ of execution issued orange county

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/22/2013
  • A/C - ATTORNEY UPDATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2012
  • REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO LAW CLERK REQUEST FOR COURT JUDGMENT SUBMITTED TO LAW CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED DECLARATION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • DECLARATION OF UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED DECLARATION OF UNAVAILABLE ORIGINAL RENTAL AGREEMENT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR COURT JUDGMENT PENDING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2012
  • RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. ORIGINAL WRIT RETURN ON ATTACHMENT/EXECUTION FILED BY THE SHERIFF'S. ORIGINAL WRIT NOT ATTACHED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • DEFAULT JUDGMENT BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • CLERK'S NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED APPLICATION FOR ISSUANCE OF WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION OF REAL PROPERTY ISSUED TO LA COUNTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • SUBMISSION FOR DEFAULT AND JUDGMENT PENDING *** DEFAULT PROCESSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2012
  • REQUEST FOR DEFAULT FILED AND ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • COMPLAINT FILED Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less

Please submit a removal request if you do not want this court record to appear in search engine results.