Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/26/2019 at 00:57:12 (UTC).

COURTNEY JOSEPH, ET AL. VS BRANDI ANTHONY

Case Summary

On 06/20/2018 COURTNEY JOSEPH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against BRANDI ANTHONY. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8667

  • Filing Date:

    06/20/2018

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

JOSEPH COURTNEY

JEMISON DOE

JOSEPH CHELSEA

Defendant

ANTHONY BRANDI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MILLMAN MICHAEL LEE

Defendant Attorney

VALDEZ LARRY ALLEN TIRADOR

 

Court Documents

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

5/17/2019: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

Answer

8/3/2018: Answer

Demand for Jury Trial

8/3/2018: Demand for Jury Trial

Complaint

6/20/2018: Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/20/2018: Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - on Complaint

6/20/2018: Summons - on Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/20/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 05/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Courtney Joseph, et al. on 06/20/2018, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Chelsea Joseph, Courtney Joseph, and Doe Jemison as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/17/2019
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Courtney Joseph (Plaintiff); Chelsea Joseph (Plaintiff); Doe Jemison (Plaintiff); As to: Brandi Anthony (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: Brandi Anthony (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2018
  • DocketDemand for Jury Trial; Filed by: Brandi Anthony (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Courtney Joseph (Plaintiff); Chelsea Joseph (Plaintiff); Doe Jemison (Plaintiff); As to: Brandi Anthony (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Courtney Joseph (Plaintiff); Chelsea Joseph (Plaintiff); Doe Jemison (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/18/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/23/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer VALDEZ LARRY ALLEN TIRADOR