This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/26/2019 at 00:55:21 (UTC).

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES, VS VILAL TRADE, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 09/21/2018 COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES filed an Other lawsuit against VILAL TRADE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2400

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Petitioner

COUNTY OF LOS ANGELES

Respondents

VILAL TRADE

LAGUNAS SANTOS

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Respondent Attorney

BERBERICH DANIEL FRANCIS

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Vehicle with Altered serial or ID number)

12/7/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing - Other Vehicle with Altered serial or ID number)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC)

1/28/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC) of 01/28/2019

1/28/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC) of 01/28/2019

RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

2/4/2019: RETURNED MAIL - RETURNED MAIL

Petition (name extension) - for disposition of Vehicle with Altered Serial

9/21/2018: Petition (name extension) - for disposition of Vehicle with Altered Serial

Notice of Hearing on Petition

9/21/2018: Notice of Hearing on Petition

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

9/21/2018: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/04/2019
  • Case reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 94 - Hon. James E. Blancarte; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/04/2019
  • RETURNED MAIL; Filed by: As to: County of Los Angeles, (Petitioner)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Minute Order (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC) of 01/28/2019; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC scheduled for 01/28/2019 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44 updated: Result Date to 01/28/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Evidentiary Hearing 402 EC scheduled for 01/28/2019 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Minute Order (Hearing - Other Vehicle with Altered serial or ID number)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2018
  • Hearing - Other Vehicle with Altered serial or ID number scheduled for 12/07/2018 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44 updated: Result Date to 12/07/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Petition for disposition of Vehicle with Altered Serial; Filed by: County of Los Angeles, (Petitioner); As to: Vilal Trade (Respondent); Santos Lagunas (Respondent)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Notice of Hearing on Petition; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Hearing on Petition scheduled for 01/25/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2018
  • Hearing - Other Vehicle with Altered serial or ID number scheduled for 12/07/2018 at 09:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 44

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer BERBERICH DANIEL FRANCIS