Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 10/16/2020 at 02:02:13 (UTC).

CORWIN RENO VS CIVIC SOLUTIONS UNLIMITED INC

Case Summary

On 10/11/2017 CORWIN RENO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CIVIC SOLUTIONS UNLIMITED INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1702

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RENO CORWIN

Huntington Beach, CA 92648

Defendants

CIVIL SOLUTIONS UNLIMITED INC

CIVIL SOLUTION UNLIMITED INC

CIVIC SOLUTIONS UNLIMITED INC

1000 South Granada Ave,

Alhambra, CA 91801

 

Court Documents

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

3/20/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/20/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

3/20/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 03/20/2018 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

3/20/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Amended Plaintiff's Claim

3/13/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Amended Plaintiff's Claim

Order on Request for Court Order

5/16/2018: Order on Request for Court Order

Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

5/16/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Order on Request for Court Order]

Request for Court Order and Answer

5/2/2018: Request for Court Order and Answer

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

5/2/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request for Court Order and Answer]

Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

7/13/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 07/13/2018

7/13/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 07/13/2018

Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

7/13/2018: Minute Order - (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

12/6/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

12/6/2017: Plaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

10/11/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (Amended)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

10/11/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/13/2018 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Request for Court Order) of 07/13/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/13/2018
  • DocketHearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 07/13/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 07/13/2018 08:30 AM at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2018
  • DocketOn the Court's own motion, Hearing on Request for Court Order scheduled for 07/13/2018 at 01:30 PM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Court was rescheduled to 07/13/2018 08:30 AM at Department R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketUpdated -- Request for Court Order and Answer: Result: Granted in Part; Result Date: 05/16/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketOrder on Request for Court Order; Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Corwin Reno (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for [Order on Request for Court Order]; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 03/20/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 03/20/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Corwin Reno against Defendant Civic Solutions Unlimited Inc on the Amended Plaintiff's Claim (1st) filed by Corwin Reno on 10/11/2017 for the principal amount of $3,000.00 and costs of $125.00 for a total of $3,125.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service Amended Plaintiff's Claim; Filed by: Corwin Reno (Plaintiff); As to: Civil Solutions Unlimited Inc (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 01/18/2018; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketRequest to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Corwin Reno (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketOver the objection of plaintiff, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 03/20/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim Cover Sheet (Postponement Before Service); Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Corwin Reno (Plaintiff); As to: Civil Solution Unlimited Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department A Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/22/2017 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2017
  • DocketAmended Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Corwin Reno (Plaintiff); As to: Civil Solutions Unlimited Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less