This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/13/2019 at 12:03:40 (UTC).

CORTEZ, ANA M. VS RIVAS, FRANK M.

Case Summary

On 05/05/2017 CORTEZ, ANA M filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against RIVAS, FRANK M. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1824

  • Filing Date:

    05/05/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORTEZ ANA M.

Defendants

RIVAS BRUNO

RIVAS FRESIA M.

RIVAS FRANK M.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BLOCK DENNIS P.

 

Court Documents

Minute Order - (OSC - RE: STAY)

8/7/2017: Minute Order - (OSC - RE: STAY)

Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

8/7/2017: Stipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge

Writ - Return

11/28/2017: Writ - Return

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2017
  • DocketWrit - Return ( Unsatisfied); Non-Party; Costs Credits: 0.00; Interest Credits: 0.00; Principal Credits: 0.00; Possession: Yes; Judgment Satisfaction Type: Unsatisfied

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketStipulation for the Appointment of Court Commissioner as Temporary Judge; Filed by: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketMinute Order (OSC - RE: STAY)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/07/2017
  • DocketOSC - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 08/07/2017 at 01:30 PM in Van Nuys Courthouse East at Department H updated: Result Date to 08/07/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion re: OSC RE STAY: Name Extension: OSC RE STAY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/02/2017
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion re: EX PARTE FOR STAY OF EXECUTION: Name Extension: EX PARTE FOR STAY OF EXECUTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketSTIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY STIPULATION FOR THE APPOINTMENT OF COURT COMMISSIONER AS TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED/FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketMOTION FILED: EX PARTE MOTION HEARING SET FOR 7/24/17

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED EX PARTE MOTION OF DEFENDANT FRESIA M. RIVAS FOR STAY OF EXECUTION; SET ASIDE/VACATE WRIT OF EXECUTION Matter is called for hearing. Ex parte is granted. Motion to be heard this date. Plaintiff and Defendant Fresia Rivas are each sworn and testify. Stay of execution of the writ of possession is granted until 8/07/17. Payment is to be made by 8/04/17. If payment is not made by 8/04/17, the writ will proceed. Certified copy of this order is forwarded to the Sheriff this date. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re stay is set for AUGUST 7, 2017, AT 1:30 P.M., IN DEPARTMENT NW-H. Clerk to give notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2017
  • DocketMOTION RULING ISSUED EX PARTE MOTION OF DEFENDANT FRESIA M. RIVAS FOR STAY OF EXECUTION; SET ASIDE/VACATE WRIT OF EXECUTION Matter is called for hearing. Ex parte is granted. Motion to be heard this date. Plaintiff and Defendant Fresia Rivas are each sworn and testify. Stay of execution of the writ of possession is granted until 8/07/17. Payment is to be made by 8/04/17. If payment is not made by 8/04/17, the writ will proceed. Certified copy of this order is forwarded to the Sheriff this date. ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE re stay is set for AUGUST 7, 2017, AT 1:30 P.M., IN DEPARTMENT NW-H. Clerk to give notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
50 More Docket Entries
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketDEFAULT JUDGMENT BY COURT/CLERK REJECTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED PROOF OF SERVICE FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketDEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP DEFAULT FOR ALL UNNAMED TENANTS GRANTED PURSUANT TO 415.46 CCP

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/30/2017
  • DocketJUDGMENT TENTATIVELY GRANTED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS (415.46 CCP) JUDGMENT TENTATIVELY GRANTED AS TO UNNAMED TENANTS (415.46 CCP)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketFEE WAIVER FILED -RESPONDENT ANSWER FILING FEE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2017
  • DocketRESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2017
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER MAILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - U.D. RESIDENTIAL Filing Fee: 240.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/05/2017
  • DocketOSC SET 11/01/17, 08:30 AM, DEPT. NWH PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less