This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/11/2019 at 18:04:15 (UTC).

CORBER, GIL VS CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Case Summary

On 12/21/2015 CORBER, GIL filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Van Nuys Courthouse East located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is LAWRENCE RIFF. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1275

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Van Nuys Courthouse East

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

LAWRENCE RIFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CORBER GIL

Defendants

ENCINO HOSPITAL

CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/21/2016
  • ACKNOWLEDGMENT OF FULL SATISFACTION OF JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • NOTICE OF ENTRY OF JUDGMENT FILED AND MAILED TO ALL PARTIES, AND JUDGMENT DEBTOR'S STATEMENT OF ASSETS MAILED TO (CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES) , (ENCINO HOSPITAL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2016
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ , HON. LAWRENCE RIFF PRESIDING FOR SMALL CLAIMS HEARING. PLAINTIFF APPEARING . DEFENDANT APPEARING .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • COURT ORDERS JUDGMENT ENTERED AS FOLLOWS :

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2016
  • JUDGMENT ENTERED AS A FINAL DISPOSITION ON 02/25/16 . FOR (CORBER, GIL) . AGAINST (CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES) , (ENCINO HOSPITAL) . PRINCIPAL $ 1750.00 . COSTS $ 105.00 . TOTAL $ 1855.00 . EXECUTION STAYED 30 DAYS. DEFENDANT'S JOINT AND SEVERALLY LIABLE CONTESTED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (ENCINO HOSPITAL) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2016
  • CERTIFIED MAIL RETURN RECEIPT FILED. SERVED AS TO (CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES) . RECEIPT # LAV . 70151730000039558406

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT MAILED BY CERTIFIED MAIL TO DEFENDANT(S) (ENCINO HOSPITAL) . RECEIPT # LAV . 70151730000039558413

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RECEIPT # 1151223E2166 . HEARING SET FOR 02/25/16 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. NWZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2015
  • COPY OF PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FOR SERVICE BY CERTIFIED MAIL ELECTRONICALLY REQUESTED FOR DEFENDANT(S) (ENCINO HOSPITAL) (CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where ENCINO HOSPITAL is a litigant

Latest cases where CMRE FINANCIAL SERVICES, INC. is a litigant