This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 02/12/2021 at 05:37:38 (UTC).

CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS TRANG P. NGUYEN, AN INDIVIDUAL

Case Summary

On 10/15/2020 CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against TRANG P NGUYEN, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANDREW C. KIM. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5920

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANDREW C. KIM

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendant

NGUYEN TRANG P. AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS SHANNON CAROL

 

Court Documents

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

11/23/2020: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/15/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/15/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Complaint - Complaint

10/15/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/15/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

10/15/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/21/2021
  • Hearing10/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2020
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Trang P. Nguyen, an individual (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 11/19/2020; Service Cost: 230.90; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 10/21/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/16/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Andrew C. Kim in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Trang P. Nguyen, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Trang P. Nguyen, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Consumer Portfolio Services, Inc., a California Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Trang P. Nguyen, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, SHANNON C