This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/08/2021 at 05:03:27 (UTC).

CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION VS DANNY MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 12/04/2020 CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC , A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against DANNY MARTINEZ, AN INDIVIDUAL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Norwalk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ANN H. PARK. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******1347

  • Filing Date:

    12/04/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Norwalk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ANN H. PARK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES INC. A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION

Defendants

MARTINEZ DANNY AN INDIVIDUAL

NABER SONIA EDITH AN INDIVIDUAL

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILLIAMS SHANNON CAROL

 

Court Documents

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

12/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

12/4/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

12/4/2020: Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740) - Order to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740)

Summons - Summons on Complaint

12/4/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

12/4/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

12/4/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet Addendum

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/10/2021
  • Hearing12/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department A at 12720 Norwalk Blvd., Norwalk, CA 90650; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service and Failure to File Default Judgment Pursuant to CRC 3.740 scheduled for 12/10/2021 at 08:30 AM in Norwalk Courthouse at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Ann H. Park in Department A Norwalk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Danny Martinez, an individual (Defendant); Sonia Edith Naber, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Danny Martinez, an individual (Defendant); Sonia Edith Naber, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Danny Martinez, an individual (Defendant); Sonia Edith Naber, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet Addendum; Filed by: CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC., a California corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Danny Martinez, an individual (Defendant); Sonia Edith Naber, an individual (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Hearing/Trial Date (Cal. Rules of Court, rule 3.740); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/04/2020
  • DocketThe case is placed in special status of: Collections Case (CCP 3.740)

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where CONSUMER PORTFOLIO SERVICES, INC., A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WILLIAMS, SHANNON C