This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/05/2019 at 00:57:46 (UTC).

COMPLETE WELDING & CUTTING SUPPLIES VS STADCO

Case Summary

On 01/27/2015 COMPLETE WELDING CUTTING SUPPLIES filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against STADCO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0848

  • Filing Date:

    01/27/2015

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMPLETE WELDING & CUTTING SUPPLIES

Defendant

STADCO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFF OF DAVID KSTNER & ASSO APC

Defendant Attorney

BYRNES & WILEY A PROF CORPORATION

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/22/2019
  • Order Case File Destroyed Per Section (s) 71008 and/or 68152 Of The Government Code; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Updated -- Order Case File Destroyed Per Section (s) 71008 and/or 68152 Of The Government Code: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • HEARING DELETED - OFF CALENDAR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2015
  • DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE-ENTIRE ACTION, FILED & ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED Pursuant to the court's online reservation system, moving party canceled the reservation. The matter is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED Pursuant to the court's online reservation system, moving party canceled the reservation. The matter is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED Pursuant to the court's online reservation system, moving party canceled the reservation. The matter is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED Pursuant to the court's online reservation system, moving party canceled the reservation. The matter is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED Pursuant to the court's online reservation system, moving party canceled the reservation. The matter is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2015
  • MOTION RULING ISSUED Pursuant to the court's online reservation system, moving party canceled the reservation. The matter is PLACED OFF CALENDAR.

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 06/24/2015
  • DEFENDANT STADCO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DOCUMENT DEMANDS IN DISPUTE DEFENDANT STADCO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF DOCUMENT DEMANDS IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM COMPLETE WELDING & CUTTING SUPPLIES TO DOCUMENT DEMANDS - SET ONE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DEFENDANT STADCO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES IN DEFENDANT STADCO'S SEPARATE STATEMENT OF SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES IN DISPUTE IN SUPPORT OF MOTION TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM WELDING & CUTTING SUPPLIES TO STADCO'S SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2015
  • DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA HOFFMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STADCO'S DECLARATION OF CHRISTINA HOFFMAN IN SUPPORT OF DEFENDANT STADCO'S MOTIONS (1) TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES FROM COMPLETE FURTHER RESPONSES FROM COMPLETE WELDING & CUTTING SUPPLIES TO STADCO'S REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS, SET ONE, AND (2) TO COMPEL FURTHER RESPONSES TO SPECIAL INTERROGATORIES, SET ONE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2015
  • NOTICE OF CHANGE OF ADDRESS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2015
  • PROOF OF SERVICE TO COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2015
  • RESPONSE FILED - ANSWER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2015
  • NON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 07/27/16, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77 * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • OSC SET 01/29/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER * * DELETED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • SUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2015
  • COMPLAINT FILED - BREACH OF CONTRACT Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMPLETE WELDING & CUTTING SUPPLIES is a litigant

Latest cases where STADCO A CALIFORNIA CORPORATION is a litigant