This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/20/2019 at 17:38:57 (UTC).

COMMUNICATIONS RELAY, LLC VS JUAN CAMARENA

Case Summary

On 11/16/2017 COMMUNICATIONS RELAY, LLC filed a Property - Other Property Fraud lawsuit against JUAN CAMARENA. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is GEORGINA T. RIZK. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******5027

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Property Fraud

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

GEORGINA T. RIZK

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMUNICATIONS RELAY LLC

Defendant

CAMARENA JUAN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADLEY BARRY ALAN

 

Court Documents

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of James A. Kay, Jr.

4/10/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of James A. Kay, Jr.

Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

4/10/2019: Memorandum of Costs (Summary) - Memorandum of Costs (Summary)

Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

4/10/2019: Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death) - Statement of Damages (Personal Injury or Wrongful Death)

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Clay R. Wilkinson

4/10/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration Declaration of Clay R. Wilkinson

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/10/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/10/2019: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment - Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

5/16/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 05/23/2019 entered for Plaintiff Communications Relay, LLC against Defendant Juan Camarena.

5/23/2019: Judgment - Judgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 05/23/2019 entered for Plaintiff Communications Relay, LLC against Defendant Juan Camarena.

Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment

6/6/2019: Notice (name extension) - Notice Notice of Entry of Judgment

Other - (name extension)

4/4/2018: Other - (name extension)

Proof of Personal Service

2/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service

8/7/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

6/28/2018: Proof of Service (not Summons and Complaint)

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

4/4/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

5/2/2018: Notice of Rejection Default/Clerk's Judgment

Summons - on Complaint

11/16/2017: Summons - on Complaint

Complaint

11/16/2017: Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

11/16/2017: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/20/2019
  • Hearingat 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: (name extension)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/12/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Entry of Default Judgment/Dismissal scheduled for 08/20/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • DocketNotice Notice of Entry of Judgment; Filed by: Communications Relay, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Camarena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/04/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 06/04/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketDefault judgment by Court entered for Plaintiff Communications Relay, LLC against Defendant Juan Camarena on the Complaint filed by Communications Relay, LLC on 11/16/2017 for damages of $7,578.74, interest of $847.37, and costs of $1,549.35 for a total of $9,975.46.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2019
  • DocketJudgment - Default Judgment By Court - Before Trial - 05/23/2019 entered for Plaintiff Communications Relay, LLC against Defendant Juan Camarena. Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 05/16/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketRequest for Entry of Default / Judgment; Filed by: Communications Relay, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Camarena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • DocketDeclaration Declaration of James A. Kay, Jr. Filed by: Communications Relay, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/04/2018
  • Docket; Default not entered as to Juan Camarena; On the Complaint filed by Communications Relay, LLC on 11/16/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/04/2018
  • DocketBrief in support of request for entry of default judgment against defendant Juan Camarena; Filed by: Communications Relay, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Communications Relay, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Camarena (Defendant); Service Date: 01/24/18; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Communications Relay, LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Juan Camarena (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Communications Relay, LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Georgina T. Rizk in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/16/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2017
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/19/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 17STLC05027    Hearing Date: February 11, 2021    Dept: 26

Communications Relay, LLC v. Camarena, et al.

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO POST-JUDGMENT INTERROGATORIES, REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 708.020, 708.030, 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Judgment Creditor Communications Relay, LLC’s (1) Motion for Order Compelling Judgment Debtor Juan Camarena to Respond to Special Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion for Order Compelling Judgment Debtor Juan Camarena to Respond to Request for Production of Documents (Set One); Request for Sanctions are GRANTED. JUDGMENT DEBTOR IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. JUDGMENT DEBTOR IS FURTHER ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $720.00 TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

ANALYSIS:

Judgment Creditor Communications Relay, LLC (“Judgment Creditor”) served Post-Judgment Special Interrogatories and Requests for Production on Judgment Debtor Juan Camarena (“Judgment Debtor”) on February 28, 2020. (Motion, Bachert Decl., Exh. D.) Despite meet and confer efforts, Judgment Debtor has not served responses as of the filing of these motions. (Id. at ¶11 and Exh. H.)

On December 2, 2020, Judgment Creditor filed the instant (1) Motion to Compel Answers to Post-Judgment Special Interrogatories (Set One); Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion to Compel Answers to Post-Judgment Request for Production of Documents; Request For Sanctions. There is no requirement for a prior meet and confer effort before a motion to compel initial responses can be filed. Further, the motion can be brought any time after the responding party fails to provide the responses. Based on the foregoing, Judgment Creditor is entitled to an order that Judgment Debtor serve verified responses to the discovery requests without objections. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 708.020, 708.030.) Responses are compelled within 20 days.

Judgment Debtor’s failure to serve timely responses is a misuse of the discovery process. Sanctions are appropriate under Code of Civil Procedure sections 708.020, 708.030, 2030.290, and 2031.300, and have been properly noticed. However, the amount sought is excessive given the simplicity of these unopposed motions. Sanctions are granted against Judgment Debtor in the amount of $720.00, based on two hours of attorney time billed at $300.00 per hour, plus two filing fees of $60.00 each, to be paid within 20 days’ service of this order. (See Motions, Bachert Decl., ¶13.)

Conclusion

Judgment Creditor Communications Relay, LLC’s (1) Motion for Order Compelling Judgment Debtor Juan Camarena to Respond to Special Interrogatories; Request for Sanctions; and (2) Motion for Order Compelling Judgment Debtor Juan Camarena to Respond to Request for Production of Documents (Set One); Request for Sanctions are GRANTED. JUDGMENT DEBTOR IS TO SERVE VERIFIED RESPONSES WITHOUT OBJECTIONS WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER. JUDGMENT DEBTOR IS FURTHER ORDERED TO PAY SANCTIONS OF $720.00 TO JUDGMENT CREDITOR’S COUNSEL WITHIN 20 DAYS’ SERVICE OF THIS ORDER.

Moving party to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNICATIONS RELAY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY BARRY ALAN