This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/16/2019 at 10:39:21 (UTC).

COMMUNICATIONS RELAY LLC VS ANGEL A IZQUIERDO

Case Summary

On 01/08/2018 COMMUNICATIONS RELAY LLC filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against ANGEL A IZQUIERDO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELAINE LU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0140

  • Filing Date:

    01/08/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

ELAINE LU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMUNICATIONS RELAY LLC

Defendant

IZQUIERDO ANGEL A

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BRADLEY BARRY ALAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2019
  • Hearingat 01:30 PM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/18/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Communications Relay Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Angel A Izquierdo (Defendant); Service Date: 07/16/2019; Service Cost: 75.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by: Communications Relay Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Angel A Izquierdo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 08/26/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/05/2019
  • DocketPursuant to the request of moving party, Hearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/08/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 08/26/2019 01:30 PM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2019
  • DocketHearing on Application for Order for Appearance and Examination scheduled for 07/08/2019 at 01:30 PM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • DocketWrit of Execution (Los Angeles); Issued by: Communications Relay Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Angel A Izquierdo (Defendant); County: Los Angeles

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/03/2019
  • DocketApplication and Order for Appearance and Examination; Filed by: Communications Relay Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Angel A Izquierdo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment or Order; Filed by: Communications Relay Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Angel A Izquierdo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 04/29/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/20/2018
  • DocketCase reassigned to Stanley Mosk Courthouse in Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Communications Relay Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Angel A Izquierdo (Defendant); Service Date: 01/15/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2018
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Communications Relay Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Angel A Izquierdo (Defendant); Service Date: 01/15/2018; Service Cost: 0.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Communications Relay Llc (Plaintiff); As to: Angel A Izquierdo (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Communications Relay Llc (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Elaine Lu in Department 77 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/08/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2018
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause - Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/11/2021 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 77

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where COMMUNICATIONS RELAY, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BRADLEY BARRY ALAN