This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/30/2019 at 16:13:36 (UTC).

COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION VS WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR

Case Summary

On 06/27/2019 COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, A FLORIDA CORPORATION filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WENDY CHANG. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6119

  • Filing Date:

    06/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WENDY CHANG

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY A FLORIDA CORPORATION

Defendants and Cross Plaintiffs

NORWOOD WILLIE RAY JR AKA WILLIAM RAYMOND NORWOOD JR AKA WILLIE NORWOOD JR AKA WILLIE NORWOOD AKA WILLIE RAY AKA RAY J. NORWOOD AKA RAY JAY NORWOOD AKA WILLIE NOORWOOD

COX RADIO INC.

Defendant and Cross Defendant

COX RADIO INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

RAGLAND KAREN

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff Attorney

FULLMAN ADAM CHRISTIAN

 

Court Documents

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

11/27/2019: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

11/15/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

10/28/2019: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

10/7/2019: Notice of Related Case - Notice of Related Case

Summons - Summons on Complaint

9/30/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Answer - Answer

9/30/2019: Answer - Answer

Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

9/30/2019: Cross-Complaint - Cross-Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

6/27/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

6/27/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

6/27/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

6/27/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

6/27/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2022
  • Hearing06/30/2022 at 10:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2020
  • Hearing12/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Department 94 at 111 North Hill Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2019
  • DocketAmendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name); Filed by: COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: Cox Radio, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Cross-Complainant); As to: Cox Radio, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2019
  • DocketProof of Service by Mail; Filed by: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Cross-Complainant); As to: Cox Radio, Inc. (Cross-Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/28/2019
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Cross-Complainant); As to: Cox Radio, Inc. (Cross-Defendant); Service Date: 10/21/2019; Service Cost: 63.16; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2019
  • DocketNotice of Related Case; Filed by: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Defendant); As to: Cox Radio, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketCross-Complaint; Filed by: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Defendant); As to: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2019
  • DocketAnswer; Filed by: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Defendant); As to: COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/24/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 06/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/01/2019
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Wendy Chang in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: COMMONWEALTH LAND TITLE INSURANCE COMPANY, a Florida Corporation (Plaintiff); As to: WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC06119    Hearing Date: March 10, 2020    Dept: 26

Commonwealth Land Title Ins. Co. v. Norwood, Jr., et al.

DEMURRER

(CCP §§ 430.31, et seq.)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendant Cox Radio, Inc.’s Demurrer to the Complaint is CONTINUED TO JULY 16, 2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE.

ANALYSIS:

On June 27, 2019, Plaintiff Commonwealth Land Title Insurance Company (“Plaintiff”) filed the instant action restitution, fraud, and breach of implied warranty against Defendants Willie Ray Norwood, Jr. aka William Raymond Norwood, Jr. aka Willie Norwood, Jr. aka Willie Norwood aka Willie Ray aka Ray J. Norwood aka Ray Jay Norwood aka Willie Norwood (“Defendant Norwood”).

On September 30, 2019, Defendant Norwood filed a Cross-Complaint against Cross-Defendant Cox Radio, Inc. (“Cox Radio”). On October 7, 2019, Defendant Norwood filed a Notice of Related Case with respect to Cox Radio, Inc. v. William Raymond Norwood, Jr. et al., LASC Case No. LS021937 (“LASC Case No. LS021937”).

On November 27, 2019, Plaintiff added Cox Radio as a doe defendant to the Complaint. Cox Radio then filed the instant Demurrer to the Complaint on February 3, 2020. To date, no opposition has been filed.

Discussion

Defendant Norwood failed to comply with requirements for service and filing of the Notice of Related Case. “The Notice of Related Case must be filed in all pending cases listed in the notice and must be served on all parties in those cases.” (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.300, subd. (e).) The Notice of Related Case, however, was not filed in LASC Case No. LS021937, which is an unlimited civil action. “Where the cases listed in the notice include both unlimited and limited civil cases, the judge who has the earliest filed unlimited civil case must determine whether the cases should be ordered related and assigned to his or her department.” (Cal. Rules of Court, Rule 3.300, subd. (h).) The judge in LASC Case No. LS021937 must make a determination as to whether the cases are related.

Based on the foregoing, the hearing on the instant Demurrer is CONTINUED TO JULY 16, 2020 AT 10:30 AM IN DEPARTMENT 26 IN THE SPRING STREET COURTHOUSE. WITHIN FIVE (5) DAYS, DEFENDANT WILLIE RAY NORWOOD, JR. IS TO FILE THE NOTICE OF RELATED CASE IN LASC CASE NO. LS021937. FAILURE TO COMPLY WITH THE COURT’S ORDER MAY RESULT IN THE DEMURRER BEING PLACED OFF CALENDAR OR OVERRULED.

Moving party to give notice.