This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/10/2019 at 01:17:10 (UTC).

COMMON AREA MAINTENANCE SERVICES, INC VS GASKA, INC

Case Summary

On 08/06/2018 COMMON AREA MAINTENANCE SERVICES, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GASKA, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Pasadena Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM D. DODSON. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******3241

  • Filing Date:

    08/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Pasadena Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM D. DODSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COMMON AREA MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC

5664 Selmaraine Drive

Culver City, CA 90230

Defendant

GASKA INC

 

Court Documents

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/19/2018

10/19/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/19/2018

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/19/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

8/6/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Annabelle G. Cortezeffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/24/2018
  • Case reassigned to Pasadena Courthouse in Department A - Hon. Annabelle G. Cortezeffective 12/24/2018; Reason: Inventory Transfer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 10/19/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • On the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Common Area Maintenance Services, Inc on 08/06/2018, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department A updated: Result Date to 10/19/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2018
  • On the Court's own motion, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R Not Held - Continued - Court's Motion was rescheduled to 10/19/2018 08:30 AM at Department A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Common Area Maintenance Services, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Gaska, Inc (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. William D. Dodson in Department R Pasadena Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/19/2018 at 08:30 AM in Pasadena Courthouse at Department R

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GASKA INC. is a litigant

Latest cases where COMMON AREA MAINTENANCE SERVICES INC. is a litigant