This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 11/08/2017 at 09:28:15 (UTC).

COLLINS CUSTOM WHEELS, INC VS SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES, INC.

Case Summary

On 09/07/2017 COLLINS CUSTOM WHEELS, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******8548

  • Filing Date:

    09/07/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLLINS CUSTOM WHEELS INC

Defendant

SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES INC.

 

Court Documents

Unknown

9/7/2017: Unknown

Unknown

11/2/2017: Unknown

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Collins Custom Wheels, Inc (Plaintiff)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/02/2017

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/02/2017
  • DocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Collins Custom Wheels, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Defendant)

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less