*******8548
09/07/2017
Disposed - Dismissed
Small Claim - Other Small Claim
Los Angeles, California
MARIA MAY J. SANTOS
COLLINS CUSTOM WHEELS INC
SELECT EQUIPMENT SALES INC.
9/7/2017: Unknown
11/2/2017: Unknown
DocketRequest for Dismissal; Filed by: Collins Custom Wheels, Inc (Plaintiff)
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 11/02/2017
[-] Read LessDocketRequest for dismissal With Prejudice entered as to entire action
[-] Read LessDocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Collins Custom Wheels, Inc (Plaintiff); As to: Select Equipment Sales, Inc. (Defendant)
[-] Read LessDocketCase assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos in Department SE2 Downey Courthouse
[-] Read LessDocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 11/08/2017 at 08:30 AM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2
[-] Read Less