This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2016 at 17:47:23 (UTC).

COLBERT, JOEL VS. WHITFIELD, DIANE

Case Summary

On 10/19/2012 COLBERT, JOEL filed a Property - Residential Eviction lawsuit against WHITFIELD, DIANE. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Governor George Deukmejian Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PATRICK T. MADDEN. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3212

  • Filing Date:

    10/19/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Property - Residential Eviction

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

PATRICK T. MADDEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COLBERT JOEL

Defendant

WHITFIELD DIANE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TIMOTHY B LIEBAERT ATTORNEY AT LAW - TIMOTHY LIEBAERT

Attorney at TIMOTHY B LIEBAERT ATTORNEY AT LAW

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/30/2015
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2015
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 06/30/15 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE LONG BEACH COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM LB 12U03212 TO LB 12F03212

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/06/2013
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION RETURNED FROM LOS ANGELES COUNTY SATISFIED WITH COSTS OF $ 125.00 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2012
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED TO LOS ANGELES COUNTY. RECEIPT # PRD . MAILED - LB

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/20/2012
  • APPLICATION FOR WRIT OF POSSESSION FILED. DAILY RENTAL VALUE OF PROPERTY, $ 25.00 PER DAY.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • STIPULATION FOR JUDGMENT FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/15/2012
  • JUDGMENT PURSUANT TO STIPULATION ORDERED ENTERED .

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/05/2012
  • MATTER SET FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL ON 11/15/12 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. SOB .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/31/2012
  • REQUEST TO SET CASE FOR UNLAWFUL DETAINER COURT TRIAL FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • DECLARATION OF MAILING FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • ANSWER FILED OF (WHITFIELD, DIANE) . RECEIPT # WAIVER .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (WHITFIELD, DIANE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2012
  • ORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (WHITFIELD, DIANE) .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • UNLAWFUL DETAINER COMPLAINT FILED. RN PRD.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • SUMMONS ISSUED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • SUMMONS FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2012
  • NOTICE OF UNLAWFUL DETAINER FILING MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TIMOTHY B. LIEGAERT ATTORNEY AT LAW - LIEBAERT, TIMOTHY B.