Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/27/2019 at 19:18:09 (UTC).

COALITION OF COURT REPORTERS OF VS CHILD & MARTON LLP

Case Summary

On 12/22/2016 COALITION OF COURT REPORTERS OF filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against CHILD MARTON LLP. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****5674

  • Filing Date:

    12/22/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

COALITION OF COURT REPORTERS OF

Defendant and Cross Plaintiff

CHILD & MARTON LLP

Cross Defendants

TWAROWSKI III EUGENE

TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SKG LAW GROUP INC

Defendant Attorney

HSU STEPHEN IMMANUEL

Cross Plaintiff Attorney

CHILD BRADFORD T.

 

Court Documents

Summons

12/22/2016: Summons

Summons

8/15/2017: Summons

Complaint - (Amended)

8/15/2017: Complaint - (Amended)

Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

12/21/2017: Minute Order - (Hearing on Demurrer without Motion to Strike)

Declaration (name extension) - of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension

1/19/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Demurring Party in Support of Automatic Extension

Declaration (name extension) - of Stephen I. Hsu in support of defendant Child and Marton LLP's demurrer to the amended complaint

2/15/2018: Declaration (name extension) - of Stephen I. Hsu in support of defendant Child and Marton LLP's demurrer to the amended complaint

Cross-Complaint

4/13/2018: Cross-Complaint

Minute Order - (Court Order)

5/30/2018: Minute Order - (Court Order)

Proof of Personal Service

7/2/2018: Proof of Personal Service

Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

8/17/2018: Request for Entry of Default / Judgment

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/5/2018: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

10/5/2018: Motion to Compel Discovery (not Further Discovery) - 1 moving party, 1 motion

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

10/23/2018: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Bradford T Child in Support of Defendant Child & Marton LLP's Opposition

11/1/2018: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration of Bradford T Child in Support of Defendant Child & Marton LLP's Opposition

Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Receipt of opposition to plaintiff's motion

11/5/2018: Notice (name extension) - Notice of Non-Receipt of opposition to plaintiff's motion

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

11/15/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

12/4/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Reply (name extension) - Reply to Opposition to Motions to Compel

12/17/2018: Reply (name extension) - Reply to Opposition to Motions to Compel

32 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketOn the Amended Complaint (2nd) filed by COALITION OF COURT REPORTERS OF on 08/15/2017, entered Order for Dismissal without prejudice as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/21/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 02/21/2019; Result Type to Not Held - Taken Off Calendar by Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 12/23/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/10/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/10/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/10/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/10/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2019
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 01/10/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94 updated: Result Date to 01/10/2019; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
58 More Docket Entries
  • 08/15/2017
  • Docket2nd Amended Summons; Filed by:

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/15/2017
  • DocketAmended Complaint Second Contract Amended Complaint; Filed by: COALITION OF COURT REPORTERS OF (Plaintiff); As to: CHILD & MARTON LLP (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2017
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE OF SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • Docket1ST AMENDED COMPLAINT FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketAMENDED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2016
  • DocketNON-JURY TRIAL SET FOR 06/22/18, 08:30 AM, DEPT 77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2016
  • DocketOSC SET 12/23/19, 08:30 AM, DEPT. 77 PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: COALITION OF COURT REPORTERS OF (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED - OTHER COLLECTION CASE Filing Fee: 370.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2016
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TWAROWSKI PACIFIC LLC is a litigant