Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/30/2019 at 00:58:53 (UTC).

CMG WORLDWIDE, INC. VS DREAMS FULFILLED, LLC

Case Summary

On 01/02/2019 CMG WORLDWIDE, INC filed a Contract - Other Contract lawsuit against DREAMS FULFILLED, LLC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JON R. TAKASUGI. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******0037

  • Filing Date:

    01/02/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Other Contract

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JON R. TAKASUGI

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CMG WORLDWIDE INC.

Defendant

DREAMS FULFILLED LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SINAI AZADEH

Defendant Attorney

FRASER COLIN W

 

Court Documents

Answer - Answer

5/28/2019: Answer - Answer

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

5/29/2019: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

5/16/2019: Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings - Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings

Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

5/16/2019: Proof of Service by Mail - Proof of Service by Mail

Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

5/20/2019: Case Management Statement - Case Management Statement

Notice of Remand from Federal Court - Notice of Remand from Federal Court

4/9/2019: Notice of Remand from Federal Court - Notice of Remand from Federal Court

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)

3/11/2019: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice)

Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice) of 03/11/2019

3/11/2019: Certificate of Mailing for - Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice) of 03/11/2019

Notice of Removal to Federal Court - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

2/13/2019: Notice of Removal to Federal Court - Notice of Removal to Federal Court

Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

1/24/2019: Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice - Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF AZADEH SINAI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

1/24/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF AZADEH SINAI IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF THEODORE J. MINCH IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

1/24/2019: Declaration (name extension) - Declaration DECLARATION OF THEODORE J. MINCH IN SUPPORT OF PETITION TO APPEAR PRO HAC VICE

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

1/2/2019: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

1/2/2019: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

1/2/2019: Complaint - Complaint

Summons - Summons on Complaint

1/2/2019: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

1/2/2019: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/29/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by: CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/28/2019
  • Answer; Filed by: Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/20/2019
  • Case Management Statement; Filed by: Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings; Filed by: CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Proof of Service by Mail; Filed by: CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2019
  • Hearing on Motion for Judgment on the Pleadings scheduled for 06/25/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Updated -- Notice of Remand from Federal Court: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • The case is removed from the special status of: Stay - Removal to Federal Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • Notice of Remand from Federal Court; Filed by: Clerk; Copy of Remand Order Attached: Yes; Date Remanded back to Superior Court: 04/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • Status Conference scheduled for 05/30/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 01/24/2019
  • Hearing on Motion to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice scheduled for 03/11/2019 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2019
  • Application to be Admitted Pro Hac Vice; Filed by: CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/01/2020 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 01/05/2022 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2019
  • Case assigned to Hon. Jon R. Takasugi in Department 94 Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Complaint; Filed by: CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Summons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Civil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: CMG Worldwide, Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2019
  • First Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 19STLC00037    Hearing Date: September 17, 2020    Dept: 50

 

Superior Court of California

County of Los Angeles

Department 50

cmg worldwide, inc.,

Plaintiff,

vs.

dreams fulfilled, llc, et al.,

Defendants.

Case No.:

19STLC00037

Hearing Date:

September 17, 2020

Hearing Time:

10:00 a.m.

ORDER RE:

THIRD-PARTY DEFENDANTS’ MOTION TO COMPEL DISCOVERY RESPONSES FROM DEFENDANT/THIRD-PARTY PLAINTIFF

AND RELATED CROSS-ACTION

The motion by Third-Party Defendants Rachel Robinson and the Estate of Jackie Robinson (“Cross-Defendants”) to compel discovery responses from Defendant/Third-Party Plaintiff Dreams Fulfilled, LLC (“Dreams Fulfilled”) will be continued to a new date as set forth below. NO HEARING ON THE MOTION WILL TAKE PLACE ON SEPTEMBER 17, 2020.

Code of Civil Procedure section 2016.080 to the Code of Civil Procedure provides, at subdivision (a): “If an informal resolution is not reached by the parties, as described in Section 2016.040, the court may conduct an informal discovery conference upon request by a party or on the court's own motion for the purpose of discussing discovery matters in dispute between the parties.” Pursuant to that Section and to the Courtroom Information posted on the Court’s website for Dept. 50 (copies also provided in Dept. 50), and the Court’s power to “amend and control its process and orders so as to make them conform to law and justice” pursuant to CCP

§ 128(a)(8), the Court orders the parties in this case to participate in an Informal Discovery Conference (“IDC”).

Lead or other designated counsel for the parties with full authority are ordered to participate in person in an IDC pursuant to the Court’s power under Code of Civil Procedure section 128(a)(8) and Code of Civil Procedure section 2016.040. After consulting with opposing counsel regarding available dates, Cross-Defendants must make a prompt reservation for the IDC using the Court’s online reservation system.

Once Cross-Defendants have confirmed an IDC date, Cross-Defendants must use the Court’s online reservation system to continue this motion to a post-IDC discovery hearing date. The parties are ordered to have with them whatever materials are needed to make the IDC session productive and successful.

Prior to the IDC date, lead or other designated counsel for the parties, with full authority, are to meet and confer, in person or via telephone (Zoom, WebEx or the like is permitted instead of in-person meetings) in a further attempt to resolve as many of the issues as possible before the IDC. (See CRC Rule 3.670(f)(2).) If the parties resolve their discovery disputes before the IDC date, Cross-Defendants are ordered to take both the IDC and this motion off calendar as soon as possible.

Cross-Defendants are ordered to provide notice of this Order.

DATED: September 16, 2020

________________________________

Hon. Teresa A. Beaudet

Judge, Los Angeles Superior Court

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Colin W Fraser