Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 04/21/2020 at 22:17:05 (UTC).

CLUB WEST VOLLEYBALL INC. VS JOSIE MACDOUGALL

Case Summary

On 12/20/2017 CLUB WEST VOLLEYBALL INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JOSIE MACDOUGALL. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, West Covina Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SUSAN J. TOWNSEND. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2656

  • Filing Date:

    12/20/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    West Covina Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SUSAN J. TOWNSEND

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLUB WEST VOLLEYBALL INC.

449 W. Foothill Blvd. #485

Glendora, CA 91741

Defendant

MACDOUGALL JOSIE

West Covina, CA 91792

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

2/13/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

2/13/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018

2/13/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

2/13/2018: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

1/3/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

12/20/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketAuthorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Club West Volleyball Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketMinute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCertificate of Mailing for Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial) of 02/13/2018; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNotice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6 updated: Result Date to 02/13/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/13/2018
  • DocketCourt orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Club West Volleyball Inc. against Defendant Josie MacDougall on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Club West Volleyball Inc. on 12/20/2017 for the principal amount of $1,080.00 and costs of $80.00 for a total of $1,160.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2018
  • DocketProof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Club West Volleyball Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Josie MacDougall (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 12/22/17; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 02/13/2018 at 08:30 AM in West Covina Courthouse at Department 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketPlaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Club West Volleyball Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Josie MacDougall (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2017
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Susan J. Townsend in Department 6 West Covina Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less