This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/15/2021 at 01:07:54 (UTC).

CLIFFORD JOHNSON VS LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/29/2020 CLIFFORD JOHNSON filed a Civil Right - Other Civil Right lawsuit against LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is SERENA R. MURILLO. The case status is Other.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******9141

  • Filing Date:

    10/29/2020

  • Case Status:

    Other

  • Case Type:

    Civil Right - Other Civil Right

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

SERENA R. MURILLO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JOHNSON CLIFFORD

Defendant

LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEHRBAN MORSE

 

Court Documents

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

10/29/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

10/29/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Complaint - Complaint

10/29/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

10/29/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

Summons - Summons on Complaint

10/29/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

10/29/2020: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court) - Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

2/10/2021: Request for Dismissal - Request for Dismissal

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/17/2021
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26 Not Held - Vacated by Court on 02/17/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketOn the Complaint filed by Clifford Johnson on 10/29/2020, entered Request for Dismissal with prejudice filed by Clifford Johnson as to the entire action

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketAddress for Morse Mehrban (Attorney) null

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Clifford Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. Serena R. Murillo in Department 26 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Clifford Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Clifford Johnson (Plaintiff); As to: Lou Sobh Cerritos Saturn, Inc. (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketRequest to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Clifford Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketOrder on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Clifford Johnson (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 04/28/2022 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 11/02/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 26

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where LOU SOBH CERRITOS SATURN INC. A DELAWARE CORPORATION DBA KIA OF CERRITOS is a litigant