This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/20/2017 at 13:47:33 (UTC).

CLEAR CHOICE LENDING VS JENNIFER GONZALEZ

Case Summary

On 11/10/2016 CLEAR CHOICE LENDING filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against JENNIFER GONZALEZ. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Downey Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is MARIA MAY J. SANTOS. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******6392

  • Filing Date:

    11/10/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Downey Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

MARIA MAY J. SANTOS

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAR CHOICE LENDING DBA QUICK TITLE LOANS

South Gate, CA 90280

Defendant

GONZALEZ JENNIFER

Anaheim, CA 92804

 

Court Documents

Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT

1/31/2017: Other - (name extension) - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/31/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 01/31/2017

1/31/2017: Minute Order of 01/31/2017

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

11/10/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

1/31/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/31/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: CLEAR CHOICE LENDING (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 01/31/2017; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/31/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2 updated: Result Date to 01/31/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Order for dismissal Without Prejudice entered as to entire action , pursuant to 664.6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2017
  • Other - SMALL CLAIMS SETTLEMENT; Filed by: CLEAR CHOICE LENDING (Plaintiff); JENNIFER GONZALEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 01/31/2017 at 01:30 PM in Downey Courthouse at Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims > $1500;<=$5,000 Filing for >$1500 - CCP 116.230(b)(2); Fee: $50.00; Payment: 50.00 Receipt: DW-2016-0007095 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name); Filed by: CLEAR CHOICE LENDING (Plaintiff); As to: JENNIFER GONZALEZ (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/10/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Maria May J. Santos at Downey Courthouse in Department SE2

    Read MoreRead Less