This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 12/13/2016 at 22:42:36 (UTC).

CLEAN UP AMERICA, INC. VS. HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

Case Summary

On 10/26/2012 CLEAN UP AMERICA, INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****1294

  • Filing Date:

    10/26/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLEAN UP AMERICA INC.

Defendants

H.B. PARKER CONSTRACTION INC.

HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION INC.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/08/2014
  • CASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2014
  • PURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 04/08/14 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * EFFECTIVE 05/13/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * CASE REASSIGNED TO THE ALHAMBRA COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2013
  • * CASE RENUMBERED FROM ELM12S01294 TO ALH12SM1294

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/30/2013
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2013
  • COURT ORDERS CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • REQUEST RE: AMENDED CLAIM RECEIVED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/19/2012
  • REQUEST TO AMEND PARTY NAME BEFORE HEARING FILED BY (CLEAN UP AMERICA, INC.) . CLAIM OF DEONTAY POTTER CHANGED TO AMEND PARTIES' NAME(S) AS FOLLOWS: HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/18/2012
  • CASE FILE RETURNED TO SMALL CLAIMS OFFICE FROM COURTROOM .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2012
  • MATTER CONTINUED FOR SMALL CLAIMS TRIAL ON 01/24/13 AT 01:30P M, IN DEPT. 001 . RECEIPT # .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • PLAINTIFF'S CLAIM AND ORDER TO DEFENDANT FILED. RN ELM524875013. HEARING SET FOR 12/13/12 AT 01:30 PM IN DPT. 001.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2012
  • AUTHORIZATION TO APPEAR ON BEHALF OF PARTY FILED AS TO (CLEAN UP AMERICA, INC.) .

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where HB PARKCO CONSTRUCTION, INC is a litigant

Latest cases where CLEAN UP AMERICA is a litigant