This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/05/2019 at 07:48:44 (UTC).

CLAVEL, ANGELA VS. SANTA YNEZ HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAT

Case Summary

On 10/25/2012 CLAVEL, ANGELA filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against SANTA YNEZ HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIAT. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is DIANA M. WHEATLEY. The case status is Disposed - Dismissed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3657

  • Filing Date:

    10/25/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Dismissed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

DIANA M. WHEATLEY

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CLAVEL ANGELA

Defendants

SANTA YNEZ HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION

TIBOLD ASSET MANAGEMENTINC.

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LAW OFFICE OF JULIA MACK - JULIA MACK ESQ

Attorney at LAW OFFICE OF JULIA MACK

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketCASE FILE ORDERED DESTROYED PER SECTION(S) 71008 AND/OR 68152 OF THE GOVERNMENT CODE.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/28/2016
  • DocketPURSUANT TO COURT ORDER THE CASE FILE WAS DESTROYED ON 12/28/16 . CASE SET TO BE PURGED FROM THE SYSTEM.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM SM 12C03657 TO LAM12CS3657

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketDISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED FOR THE ENTIRE ACTION AS TO ALL DEFENDANT(S) AND ALL CAUSES OF ACTION(S).

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • DocketCOMPLAINT FILED. RN SM278868004.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • DocketSUMMONS FILED.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • DocketNON-APPEARANCE CASE MANAGEMENT REVIEW SCHEDULED FOR 04/24/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. CLK . CLERK`S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE MAILED/GIVEN TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL ON 10/25/12

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/25/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. WED OF HONORABLE DIANA M. WHEATLEY .

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where TIBOLD ASSET MANAGEMENT INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MACK, JULIA