Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 03/26/2021 at 05:50:25 (UTC).

CLAUDIA ELIZABETH RAMIREZ VS LEVON ALAMSHARYAN, ET AL.

Case Summary

On 04/01/2020 CLAUDIA ELIZABETH RAMIREZ filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against LEVON ALAMSHARYAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Spring Street Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is JAMES E. BLANCARTE. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2934

  • Filing Date:

    04/01/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Spring Street Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

JAMES E. BLANCARTE

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

RAMIREZ CLAUDIA ELIZABETH

Defendants

ALAMSHARYAN KADEMYAN

ALAMSHARYAN LEVON

ALAMSHARYAN ARA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JIMENEZ DANIEL FERNANDO

Defendant Attorney

LEE JAMES

 

Court Documents

Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories & Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents & Sanctions

3/22/2021: Opposition (name extension) - Opposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories & Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents & Sanctions

Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

3/24/2021: Minute Order - Minute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY

10/6/2020: Motion for Order (name extension) - Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY

Answer - Answer

9/17/2020: Answer - Answer

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Levon

9/2/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Levon

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Levon

8/14/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Levon

Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

7/15/2020: Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name) - Amendment to Complaint (Fictitious/Incorrect Name)

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Levon

7/27/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem for Levon

Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Levon

5/28/2020: Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem - Application And Order For Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem Levon

Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

5/15/2020: Notice of Posting of Jury Fees - Notice of Posting of Jury Fees

Answer - Answer

5/15/2020: Answer - Answer

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

4/17/2020: Proof of Personal Service - Proof of Personal Service

Summons - Summons on Complaint

4/1/2020: Summons - Summons on Complaint

Complaint - Complaint

4/1/2020: Complaint - Complaint

Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

4/1/2020: Civil Case Cover Sheet - Civil Case Cover Sheet

First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

4/1/2020: First Amended Standing Order - First Amended Standing Order

Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

4/1/2020: Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case - Notice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/05/2023
  • Hearing04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Order to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • Hearing09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Department 25 at 312 North Spring Street, Los Angeles, CA 90012; Non-Jury Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketMinute Order (Hearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery...)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 03/24/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25 updated: Result Date to 03/24/2021; Result Type to Held - Motion Granted

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketOpposition to Motion to Compel Responses to Form Interrogatories & Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents & Sanctions; Filed by: Claudia Elizabeth Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketUpdated -- Motion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES LEE: As To Parties: removed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2020
  • DocketHearing on Motion to Compel Discovery (not "Further Discovery") scheduled for 03/24/2021 at 10:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2020
  • DocketMotion for Order NOTICE OF MOTION AND MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR AN ORDER IMPOSING MONETARY SANCTIONS; MEMORANDUM OF POINTS AND AUTHORITIES; DECLARATION OF JAMES LEE; Filed by: Claudia Elizabeth Ramirez (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Claudia Elizabeth Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Kademyan Alamsharyan (Defendant); Service Date: 04/10/2020; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2020
  • DocketProof of Personal Service; Filed by: Claudia Elizabeth Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Levon Alamsharyan (Defendant); Service Date: 04/10/2020; Service Cost: 50.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketNon-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/29/2021 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketOrder to Show Cause Re: Failure to File Proof of Service scheduled for 04/05/2023 at 08:30 AM in Spring Street Courthouse at Department 25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2020
  • DocketCase assigned to Hon. James E. Blancarte in Department 25 Spring Street Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketComplaint; Filed by: Claudia Elizabeth Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Levon Alamsharyan (Defendant); Kademyan Alamsharyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketCivil Case Cover Sheet; Filed by: Claudia Elizabeth Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Levon Alamsharyan (Defendant); Kademyan Alamsharyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketSummons on Complaint; Issued and Filed by: Claudia Elizabeth Ramirez (Plaintiff); As to: Levon Alamsharyan (Defendant); Kademyan Alamsharyan (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketNotice of Case Assignment - Limited Civil Case; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/01/2020
  • DocketFirst Amended Standing Order; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less

Tentative Rulings

Case Number: 20STLC02934    Hearing Date: March 24, 2021    Dept: 25

HEARING DATE: Wed., March 24, 2021 JUDGE /DEPT: Blancarte/25

CASE NAME: Ramirez v. Alamsharyan, et al. COMPL. FILED: 04-01-20

CASE NUMBER: 20STLC02934 DISC. C/O: 08-30-21

NOTICE: OK DISC. MOT. C/O: 09-14-21

TRIAL DATE: 09-29-21

PROCEEDINGS: (1) MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO FORM INTERROGATORIES AND FOR SANCTIONS

(2) MOTION FOR ORDER COMPELLING RESPONSES TO DEMAND FOR INSPECTION AND PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS AND FOR SANCTIONS

MOVING PARTY: Defendants Levon Alamsharyan, Marine Alamsharyan, Kademyan Alamsharyan, and Ara Alamsharyan

RESP. PARTY: None

MOTION TO COMPEL RESPONSES TO INTERROGATORIES AND REQUEST FOR PRODUCTION OF DOCUMENTS; REQUEST FOR SANCTIONS

(CCP §§ 2030.290; 2031.300)

TENTATIVE RULING:

Defendants’ (1) Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Form Interrogatories and (2) Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to provide responses without objections to Defendants’ discovery requests within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. Defendants’ requests for sanctions are also GRANTED in the amount of $430.50 to be paid to Defendants’ counsel within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

SERVICE:

[X] Proof of Service Timely Filed (CRC, rule 3.1300) OK

[X] Correct Address (CCP §§ 1013, 1013a) OK

[X] 16/21 Court Days Lapsed (CCP §§ 12c, 1005(b)) OK

OPPOSITION: None filed as of March 22, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

REPLY: None filed as of March 22, 2021 [ ] Late [X] None

ANALYSIS:

  1. Background

On April 1, 2020, Plaintiff Claudia Elizabeth Ramirez (“Plaintiff”) filed an action against Levon Alamsharyan (“Levon”) and Kademyan Alamsharyan (“Kademyan”). Defendants Levon and Kademyan filed an Answer on May 15, 2020. Plaintiff filed an amendment to the Complaint on July 15, 2020, substituting Defendant Ara Alamsharyan (“Ara”) for Doe 1. On September 2, 2020, Marine Kademyan (“Marine”) was appointed as minor Defendant Levon’s guardian ad litem. Defendant Ara filed an Answer on September 17, 2020.

On October 6, 2020, Defendants filed the instant (1) Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Form Interrogatories and for Sanctions and (2) Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents and for Sanctions (collectively, the “Motions”). To date, no opposition has been filed.

  1. Legal Standard & Discussion

A. Request for Production & Interrogatories

A party must respond to interrogatories and requests for production of documents within 30 days after service. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.260, subd. (a); Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.260, subd. (a).) If a party to whom interrogatories or requests for production of documents are directed does not provide timely responses, the requesting party may move for an order compelling responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (b); Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300, subd. (c).) The party also waives the right to make any objections, including one based on privilege or work-product protection. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290, subd. (a); Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300, subd. (a).) There is no time limit for a motion to compel responses to interrogatories or production of documents other than the cut-off on hearing discovery motions 15 days before trial. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2024.020, subd. (a), 2030.290; Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300.) No meet and confer efforts are required before filing a motion to compel responses to the discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2030.290; Code Civ. Proc., § 2031.300; Sinaiko Healthcare Consulting, Inc. v. Pacific Healthcare Consultants (2007) 148 Cal.App.4th 390, 411.)

Here, Defendants’ counsel served Plaintiff’s counsel with Form Interrogatories, Set One, and Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents, Set One, on May 15, 2020 via email. (Motions, Lee Decl., ¶¶ 2, Exhs. A.) Although not statutorily required, Defendants’ counsel sent Plaintiff’s counsel a letter regarding the overdue discovery responses. (Interrogatories Mot., Lee Decl., ¶ 3; Production Mot., Lee Decl., ¶ 3, Exhs. B, C.) On August 10, 2020, Defendants’ counsel provided a further extension through August 31, 2020. (Id.) As of the date of these Motions, Defendant had not received any responses. (Interrogatories Mot., Lee Decl., ¶ 4, Production Mot., Lee Decl., ¶ 5.) Thus, Defendants are entitled to an order compelling Plaintiff to provide verified responses without objections. (Code Civ. Proc., §§ 2030.290, 2031.300.)

B. Sanctions

Code of Civil Procedure section 2023.030, subdivision (a) provides, in pertinent part, that the court may impose a monetary sanction on a party engaging in the misuse of the discovery process to pay the reasonable expenses, including attorney’s fees, incurred by anyone as a result of that conduct. A misuse of the discovery process includes failing to respond or submit to an authorized method of discovery. (Code Civ. Proc., § 2023.010, subd. (d).)

The Court finds Plaintiff’s failure to respond to Defendants’ discovery requests a misuse of the discovery process.

Defendants’ counsel seeks a total of $891.00 in sanctions based on four hours of attorney time billed at $143.75 per hour, two hours of legal assistant time billed at $75.00 per hour, two remote appearance fees of $23.00, and two filing fees of $60.00. (Interrogatories Mot., Lee Decl., ¶ 5; Production Mot., Lee Decl., ¶ 6.) However, the amount sought is excessive given the simplicity of these nearly identical Motions and the lack of opposition and reply. The Court finds $430.50, based on two hours of attorney time, one remote appearance fee, and two filing fees, to be reasonable.

  1. Conclusion & Order

For the foregoing reasons, Defendants’ Defendants’ (1) Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Form Interrogatories and (2) Motion for Order Compelling Responses to Demand for Inspection and Production of Documents is GRANTED. Plaintiff is ordered to provide responses without objections to Defendants’ discovery requests within thirty (30) days of notice of this order. Defendants’ requests for sanctions are also GRANTED in the amount of $430.50 to be paid to Defendants’ counsel within thirty (30) days of notice of this order.

Moving party is ordered to give notice.

related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer LEE JAMES