Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/19/2017 at 19:00:04 (UTC).

CLAUDIA C. ESCALANTE VS RIKA ATHENA NAVARRO

Case Summary

On 11/18/2016 CLAUDIA C ESCALANTE filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RIKA ATHENA NAVARRO. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Alhambra Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is TONY L. RICHARDSON. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******4802

  • Filing Date:

    11/18/2016

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Alhambra Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

TONY L. RICHARDSON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ESCALANTE CLAUDIA C.

Victorville, CA 92392

Defendant

NAVARRO RIKA ATHENA

Diamond Bar, CA 91765

 

Court Documents

Notice of Postponement

3/14/2017: Notice of Postponement

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

3/10/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

1/26/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

1/26/2017: Notice of Appeal on Small Claims Judgment

Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

12/30/2016: Notice of Payment Due on Waived Fees and Costs

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

12/30/2016: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

12/30/2016: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

[Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits]

8/3/2017: [Application and Order to Withdraw Exhibits]

Unknown

7/31/2017: Unknown

Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

7/25/2017: Judgment Creditor's Request for Funds

[Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]

7/19/2017: [Notice to Judgment Creditor (Small Claims)]

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

11/18/2016: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

Minute Order of 06/13/2017

6/13/2017: Minute Order of 06/13/2017

Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

6/13/2017: Minute Order - (Ruling on Submitted Matter)

Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

6/9/2017: Minute Order - (Trial De Novo - Small Claims Appeal)

Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

11/18/2016: Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

4/17/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

4/18/2017: Notice of Postponement

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/10/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Balance: $75.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Invoice: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Fee: $40.00; Balance: $40.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Request to Pay Judgment to Court; Filed by: Claudia C. Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims Pay Jdgmt to Court Fee-Pmt of jdgmt to ct-CCP 116.860; Fee: $20.00; Payment: 17.41 Receipt: AH-2017-0014861 (Check); Payment: 2.59 Receipt: AH-2017-0014861 (Check); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Payment: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Amount: $37.41 Receipt: AH-2017-0014861 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Payment: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Amount: $75.00 Receipt: AH-2017-0014861 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Payment: Sheriff?s Recovery Fee; Amount: $2.59 Receipt: AH-2017-0014861 (Check)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Trust Deposit: Civil Trust Account; Amount: $5,035.25 Receipt: AH-2017-0014861 (Check); Party: Rika Athena Navarro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/10/2017
  • Trust Deposit: Civil Trust Account; Amount: $2.59 Receipt: AH-2017-0014861 (Check); Party: Rika Athena Navarro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/15/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
30 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2016
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2016
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Claudia C. Escalante against Defendant Rika Athena Navarro on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Claudia C. Escalante on 11/18/2016 for the principal amount of $10,000.00 and costs of $115.00 for a total of $10,115.00.; This judgment results from a motor vehicle accident on a California highway and was caused by the judgment debtor's operation of a motor vehicle. If the judgment is not paid, the judgment creditor may apply to have the judgment debtor's drivers license suspended.; Waived fees and costs in the amount of $115.00, including those incurred after judgment, must be paid directly to the court by Defendant Rika Athena Navarro. A full or partial satisfaction of judgment will not be entered unless waived fees are paid per Government Code section 68637(b)(1). An Administrative fee of $25.00 must be assessed if the collection process is initiated to collect unpaid fees per Government Code section 68638.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2016
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Claudia C. Escalante (Plaintiff); As to: Rika Athena Navarro (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: Yes; Service Date: 11/29/2016

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Claudia C. Escalante (Plaintiff); As to: Rika Athena Navarro (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Request to Waive Court Fees; Filed by: Claudia C. Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Order on Court Fee Waiver (Superior Court); Signed and Filed by: Clerk; As to: Claudia C. Escalante (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Invoice: Small Claims >$ 5,000 to $10,000- CCP116.230(b)(3);CCP 116.221; Fee: $75.00; Payment: 75.00 Receipt: AH-2016-0006237 (Waived Court); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Case assigned to Hon. Tony L. Richardson at Alhambra Courthouse in Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 12/30/2016 at 08:30 AM in Alhambra Courthouse at Department NE2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2016
  • Updated -- Request to Waive Court Fees: Result Date changed from 11/18/2016 to 11/18/2016

    Read MoreRead Less