This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 07/02/2019 at 00:57:03 (UTC).

CITYWIDE TOWING INC. VS CARLOS VENEGAS

Case Summary

On 07/11/2018 CITYWIDE TOWING INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CARLOS VENEGAS. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is PHILIP K. MAUTINO. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******7744

  • Filing Date:

    07/11/2018

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

PHILIP K. MAUTINO

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITYWIDE TOWING INC.

1501 N. Fishburn Ave

Los Angeles, CA 90063

Defendant

VENEGAS CARLOS

Paramount, CA 90723

 

Court Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

10/24/2018: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims) - Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service

10/15/2018: Proof of Service by Substituted Service

Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

10/24/2018: Minute Order - Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

10/24/2018: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims) - Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

10/9/2018: Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims)

Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

8/21/2018: Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Notice of Postponement

8/17/2018: Notice of Postponement

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

8/17/2018: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

8/17/2018: Certificate of Mailing for - [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]

Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

7/24/2018: Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims)

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

7/11/2018: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/24/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff Citywide Towing Inc. against Defendant Carlos Venegas on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by Citywide Towing Inc. on 07/11/2018 for the principal amount of $1,900.00 and costs of $90.00 for a total of $1,990.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Court orders judgment entered on the Defendant's Claim filed by Carlos Venegas on 10/09/2018 as follows: Plaintiff Citywide Towing Inc. does not owe the defendant Carlos Venegas any money on defendant's claim.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Citywide Towing Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 10/24/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A updated: Result Date to 10/24/2018; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2018
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service; Filed by: Carlos Venegas (Defendant); As to: Citywide Towing Inc. (Plaintiff); Proof of Mailing Date: 10/10/2018; Service Cost: 20.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims); Filed by: Carlos Venegas (Defendant); As to: Citywide Towing Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Updated -- Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Citywide Towing Inc. (Plaintiff) to Citywide Towing Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/09/2018
  • Updated -- Defendant's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (Small Claims): As To Parties changed from Citywide Towing Inc. (Plaintiff) to Citywide Towing Inc. (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2018
  • Pursuant to the request of defendant, Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A Not Held - Rescheduled by Party was rescheduled to 10/24/2018 08:30 AM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2018
  • Order on Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Clerk; As to: Carlos Venegas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: Carlos Venegas (Defendant); Has the Claim Been Served?: Yes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Certificate of Mailing for [Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)]; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2018
  • Notice of Postponement; Issued by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/24/2018
  • Proof of Service - Personal (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party; As to: Carlos Venegas (Defendant); Service Cost: 40.00; Service Cost Waived: No; Service Date: 07/19/18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: Citywide Towing Inc. (Plaintiff); As to: Carlos Venegas (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Case assigned to Hon. Philip K. Mautino in Department 1A Stanley Mosk Courthouse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2018
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 09/06/2018 at 08:30 AM in Stanley Mosk Courthouse at Department 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Citywide Towing Inc is a litigant