This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 06/25/2018 at 23:47:42 (UTC).

CITY TITLE LOAN LLC VS DALANA CAMILLA JONES

Case Summary

On 03/22/2017 CITY TITLE LOAN LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DALANA CAMILLA JONES. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Inglewood Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is WILLIAM MCTAGGART. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    *******2290

  • Filing Date:

    03/22/2017

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Inglewood Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

WILLIAM MCTAGGART

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY TITLE LOAN LLC DBA CITY LOAN

3431 Cherry Avenue

Long Beach, CA 90807

Defendant

JONES DALANA CAMILLA

Inglewood, CA 90301

 

Court Documents

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

3/22/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Payment Due

Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

3/22/2017: Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court - (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

3/22/2017: Notice (name extension) - E-Filing Receipt of Documents

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

7/12/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Minute Order of 07/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

7/12/2017: Minute Order of 07/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets

Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

7/12/2017: Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims)

Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

7/12/2017: Minute Order - (Non-Jury Trial)

Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: JANE DOE, CO-OCCUPANT

6/9/2017: Proof of Service by Substituted Service - SERVED: JANE DOE, CO-OCCUPANT

Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

5/18/2017: Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims)

Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

5/18/2017: Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims)

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2017
  • Minute Order (Non-Jury Trial)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Updated -- Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: JANE DOE, CO-OCCUPANT: Result: Result Date: 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Certificate of Mailing for Minute Order of 07/12/2017 and Judgment Debtor Statement of Assets; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Notice of Entry of Judgment (Small Claims); Entered by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 07/12/2017 at 01:30 PM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 updated: Result Date to 07/12/2017; Result Type to Held

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Court orders judgment entered for Plaintiff City Title Loan LLC DBA City Loan against Defendant Dalana Camilla Jones on the Plaintiff's Claim filed by City Title Loan LLC on 03/22/2017 for the principal amount of $2,500.00 and costs of $105.00 for a total of $2,605.00.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: City Title Loan LLC (Plaintiff)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2017
  • Proof of Service by Substituted Service SERVED: JANE DOE, CO-OCCUPANT; Filed by: City Title Loan LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Dalana Camilla Jones (Defendant); Proof of Mailing Date: 06/02/17; Service Cost: 55.00; Service Cost Waived: No

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Authorization to Appear on Behalf of Party (Small Claims); Filed by: Non-Party

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2017
  • Request to Postpone Trial (Small Claims); Filed by: City Title Loan LLC (Plaintiff); Has the Claim Been Served?: No

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 05/18/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8 Not Held - Rescheduled by Court to 07/12/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Small Claims > 12 per year-Filing by person >12/year- CCP 116.230(c); Fee: $100.00; Payment: 100.00 Receipt: 1170322E0656 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Invoice: Web eFiling Transaction Fee - CRC 2.506; Fee: $10.00; Payment: 10.00 Receipt: 1170322E0656 (Credit Card); Balance: $0.00;

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Case assigned to Hon. William McTaggart at Inglewood Courthouse in Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Non-Jury Trial scheduled for 05/18/2017 at 08:30 AM in Inglewood Courthouse at Department 8

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/23/2017
  • Updated -- Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court (w/ Fictitious Business Name): Name Extension: (w/ Fictitious Business Name)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Plaintiff's Claim and Order to Go to Small Claims Court; Filed by: City Title Loan LLC (Plaintiff); As to: Dalana Camilla Jones (Defendant)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Receipt of Documents; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice of E-Filing Acceptance (Small Claims)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2017
  • Notice E-Filing Payment Due; Filed by: Clerk

    Read MoreRead Less