This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 08/28/2019 at 14:16:01 (UTC).

CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD VS MOGADAMYAN, VIGEN

Case Summary

On 03/09/2012 CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against MOGADAMYAN, VIGEN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judge overseeing this case is ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****0843

  • Filing Date:

    03/09/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD

Defendant

MOGADAMYAN VIGEN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* EFFECTIVE 05/06/2013

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/06/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 12C00843 TO LAM12CB0843

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 004 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING ERIC RUIZ . RESPONDENT APPEARING VIGEN MOGADAMYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketCOURT RULES THAT THE FINAL DECISION OF THE PROCESSING AGENCY IS AFFIRMED. REFERENCE #613731963 MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/26/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 004 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU, COMMISSIONER PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT APPEARING ERIC RUIZ . RESPONDENT APPEARING VIGEN MOGADAMYAN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 4 RE: PARKING APPEAL ON 7/26/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketSTIPULATION AND ORDER APPOINTING TEMPORARY JUDGE SIGNED AND FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 004 RE: PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2012
  • DocketMATTER CONTINUED FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION TO 07/26/12 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • DocketAPPEAL FROM FINAL DETERMINATION OF PARKING VIOLATION FILED. RN BH278865023. Filing Fee: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION FILED AS TO (CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD) , IN PERSON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION ON 06/28/12 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 004 .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/09/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 004 OF HONORABLE ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU .

    Read MoreRead Less