This case was last updated from Los Angeles County Superior Courts on 09/04/2019 at 20:32:30 (UTC).

CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD VS KAUTH, BRIAN

Case Summary

On 10/10/2012 CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD filed an Infraction - Parking lawsuit against KAUTH, BRIAN. This case was filed in Los Angeles County Superior Courts, Stanley Mosk Courthouse located in Los Angeles, California. The Judges overseeing this case are BOBBI TILLMON and ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU. The case status is Disposed - Judgment Entered.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****3484

  • Filing Date:

    10/10/2012

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Judgment Entered

  • Case Type:

    Infraction - Parking

  • Court:

    Los Angeles County Superior Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Stanley Mosk Courthouse

  • County, State:

    Los Angeles, California

Judge Details

Judge

BOBBI TILLMON

Presiding Judge

ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD

Defendant

KAUTH BRIAN

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/17/2013
  • Docket* CASE RENUMBERED FROM BH 12C03484 TO LAM12CB3484

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2013
  • Docket* CASE REASSIGNED TO THE STANLEY MOSK COURTHOUSE FOR FURTHER PROCEEDINGS.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2013
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF PARKING APPEAL MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL PARTIES. CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT NOT APPEARING. RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketMINUTE ORDER - CAUSE CALLED AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 , HON. ELIZABETH MUNISOGLU PRESIDING RE: APPEAL TO A FINAL DECISION ON A PARKING VIOLATION. APPELLANT NOT APPEARING. RESPONDENT NOT APPEARING.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2013
  • DocketCOURT RULES THAT THE FINAL DECISION OF THE PROCESSING AGENCY IS AFFIRMED. MINUTE ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE OF RULING MAILED TO ALL RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2013
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO DEPT. 005 RE: PARKING APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2013
  • DocketAMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING PARKING APPEAL FILED AND MAILED TO RESPECTIVE PARTIES/COUNSEL. MATTER SET FOR HEARING ON 04/12/13 AT 08:30A M, IN DEPT. 005 . CLERK'S CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FILED.

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 10/24/2012
  • DocketREJECT SHEET SENT TO (KAUTH, BRIAN) FOR REJECTION OF THIS IS NOT A REJECT BUT A NOTICE TO COMPLY: PLEASE REMEMBER TO RETURN TO MY ATTENTION THE PROOF OF SERVICE COMPLETED AND SIGNED TO INDICATE A COPY OF NOTICE OF APPEAL MAILED TO CITY OF W. HOLLYWOOD. SUBMITTED ON 10/10/12

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE FORWARDED TO CIVIL CLERK AMY'S DESK RE: FOLLOW UP ON PROOF OF SERVICE TO BE SUBMITTED BY DEFENDANT AS TO THE APPEAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2012
  • DocketCASE FILE RETURNED TO CIVIL DEPARTMENT FROM COURTROOM.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • DocketREQUEST AND ORDER TO WAIVE COURT FEES AS TO (KAUTH, BRIAN) FILED AND FORWARDED TO DEPARTMENT 006 FOR CONSIDERATION.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/17/2012
  • DocketORDER GRANTING REQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES SIGNED AND FILED AS TO (KAUTH, BRIAN) . PARTIAL ONLY: FILING; COPYING; CERTIFICATION; TRANSMITTAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketAPPEAL FROM FINAL DETERMINATION OF PARKING VIOLATION FILED. RN FEE WAIVER. Filing Fee: 25.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketPROOF OF SERVICE RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION FILED AS TO (CITY OF WEST HOLLYWOOD) , BY MAIL .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketNOTICE OF CASE ASSIGNMENT ON FILE. CASE IS ASSIGNED TO DEPT. 005 OF HONORABLE BOBBI TILLMON .

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketMATTER SET FOR HEARING RE: APPEAL ON PARKING VIOLATION ON 02/27/13 AT 08:30A M., IN DEPT. 005 . 614797341

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/10/2012
  • DocketREQUEST TO WAIVE COURT FEES FILED BY (KAUTH, BRIAN) .

    Read MoreRead Less